California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB935 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/25/2013

 BILL NUMBER: AB 935AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 25, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 18, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Frazier (Coauthor: Assembly Member Bonilla) FEBRUARY 22, 2013 An act to amend Section 66540.12 of the Government Code, relating to the San Francisco Bay Area Water Emergency Transportation Authority. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 935, as amended, Frazier. San Francisco Bay Area Water Emergency Transportation Authority: terms of board members. Existing law establishes the San Francisco Bay Area Water Emergency Transportation Authority with specified powers and duties, including, but not limited to, the authority to coordinate the emergency activities of all water transportation and related facilities within the bay area region, as defined. Existing law provides for a board of directors of the authority, 3 members of which are appointed by the Governor and one each by the Senate Committee on Rules and the Speaker of the Assembly. Directors serve 6-year terms. This bill would expand the number of members appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules and the Speaker of the Assembly to 2 members each. The bill would require that the initial terms of the additional members appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules and the Speaker of the Assembly pursuant to its provisions shall be 2 years and 6 years, respectively. The bill would  also  require that  one of  the 3 members appointed by the Governor be a  resident of the County of Contra Costa selected from a list of 3 nominees provided by the Contra Costa Transportation Authority, a resident of the County of San Mateo selected from a list of 3 nominees provided by the San Mateo County Transportation Authority, and   bona fide labor representative and that another member be  a resident of the  County of Solano   City and County of San Francisco  selected from a list of 3 nominees provided by the  Solano   San Francisco County  Transportation Authority.  The bill would require the Governor to appoint a resident of the county of one of these transportation authorities that fails to submit a list of 3 nominees to the Governor within 45 days of a vacancy.   The bill would require that the 2 members appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules be a resident of the County of Contra Costa selected from a list of 3 nominees provided by the Contra Costa Transportation Authority and a resident of the County of San Mateo selected from a list of 3 nominees provided by the San Mateo County Transportation Authority. The bill would require that the 2 members appointed by the Speaker of the Assembly be a resident of the County of Solano selected from a list of nominees provided by the Solano Transportation Authority and a resident of the County of Alameda selected from a list of 3 nominees provided by the Alameda County Transportation Authority. The bill would provide for the Senate Committee on Rules or the Speaker of the Assembly, as applicable, to appoint a resident of the county if a transportation authority fails to submit a list of 3 nominees within 45 days of a vacancy.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 66540.12 of the Government Code is amended to read: 66540.12. (a) The authority shall be governed by a board composed of seven members, as follows: (1) Three members shall be appointed by the Governor, subject to confirmation by the Senate. The Governor shall make the initial appointment of these members of the board no later than January 11, 2008. (A) One member appointed by the Governor shall be a  resident of the County of Contra Costa and shall be selected from a list of three nominees provided by the Contra Costa Transportation Authority. If the authority fails to submit a list of three nominees within 45 days of a vacancy, the Governor shall appoint a resident of that county   bona fide labor representative  .  (B) One member appointed by the Governor shall be a resident of the County of San Mateo and shall be selected from a list of three nominees provided by the San Mateo County Transportation Authority. If the authority fails to submit a list of three nominees within 45 days of a vacancy, the Governor shall appoint a resident of that county.   (C)   (   B)  One member appointed by the Governor shall be a resident of the  County of Solano   City and County of San Francisco  and shall be selected from a list of three nominees provided by the  Solano   San Francisco County  Transportation Authority. If the authority fails to submit a list of three nominees within 45 days of a vacancy, the Governor shall appoint a resident of that county. (2) Two members shall be appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules  .   as follows:   (A) One member appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules shall be a resident of the County of Contra Costa and shall be selected from a list of three nominees provided by the Contra Costa Transportation Authority. If the authority fails to submit a list of three nominees within 45 days of a vacancy, the Senate Committee on Rules shall appoint a resident of that county.   (B) One member appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules shall be a resident of the County of San Mateo and shall be selected from a list of three nominees provided by the San Mateo County Transportation Authority. If the authority fails to submit a list of three nominees within 45 days of a vacancy, the Senate Committee on Rules shall appoint a resident of that county.  (3) Two members shall be appointed by the Speaker of the Assembly  .   as follows:  (A) One member appointed by the Speaker of the Assembly shall be a resident of the County of Solano and shall be selected from a list of three nominees provided by the Solano Transportation Authority. If the authority fails to submit a list of three nominees within 45 days of a vacancy, the Speaker of the Assembly shall appoint a resident of that county.   (B) One member appointed by the Speaker of the Assembly shall be a resident of the County of Alameda and shall be selected from a list of three nominees provided by the Alameda County Transportation Authority. If the authority fails to submit a list of three nominees within 45 days of a vacancy, the Speaker of the Assembly shall appoint a resident of that county.  (b) Each member of the board shall be a resident of a county in the bay area region. (c) Public officers associated with an area of government, including planning or water, whether elected or appointed, may be appointed to serve contemporaneously as members of the board. A public agency shall not have more than one representative on the board of the authority. (d) The Governor shall designate one member as the chairperson of the board and one member as the vice chairperson of the board. (e) Except as provided in subdivisions (f) and (g), the term of a member of the board shall be six years. (f) (1) Except as to initial appointments specified in subdivision (g), the appointments next following the expiration of the terms of the initial appointments shall be for the following terms: (A) Two of the members appointed by the Governor shall serve terms of two years and one shall serve a term of six years. (B) The member appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules shall serve a term of four years. (C) The member appointed by the Speaker of the Assembly shall serve a term of four years. (2) Each member appointed after the expiration of the terms set forth in subparagraphs (A) to (C), inclusive, of paragraph (1) shall serve a term of six years. (g) The initial terms for additional appointees of the Senate Committee on Rules and the Speaker of the Assembly added to the authority pursuant to the act that added this subdivision shall be the following: (1) The additional member appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules shall serve a term of two years. (2) The additional member appointed by the Speaker of the Assembly shall serve a term of six years. (h) Vacancies shall be filled immediately by the appointing power for the unexpired portion of the terms in which they occur.