BILL NUMBER: ACR 117CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 93 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 15, 2014 ADOPTED IN SENATE JUNE 26, 2014 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 30, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 28, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Ting MARCH 4, 2014 Relative to the Hanren Chang Memorial. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 117, Ting. Hanren Chang Memorial. This measure would request the Department of Transportation to grant, without charge, an encroachment permit or permits, if required, authorizing an appropriate memorial plaque, funded by nonstate sources, to be placed within the right-of-way of State Highway Route 35 within the vicinity of the pedestrian beacon between Vale Avenue and Forest View Drive in San Francisco in memory of Hanren Chang. WHEREAS, Hanren Chang was born on March 2, 1996, in Daly City, and grew up in the City and County of San Francisco; and WHEREAS, Hanren Chang attended Lowell High School in San Francisco and was an avid runner on the track and cross-country teams; and WHEREAS, Hanren Chang was loved and respected by her family and friends and was known as a selfless and loving person; and WHEREAS, On the evening of her birthday, March 2, 2013, Hanren Chang was the victim of a car accident that occurred under tragic circumstances involving a drunk driver on State Highway Route 35, also known as Sloat Boulevard, near Forest View Drive in San Francisco; and WHEREAS, Hanren Chang's death has affected and touched the lives of many people, increased the call for pedestrian safety improvements along State Highway Route 35 in San Francisco, and heightened public awareness of the number of pedestrian fatalities in San Francisco; and WHEREAS, Hanren Chang continues to be remembered for her sense of humor, laughter, and smile and is survived by her parents and one sister; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Department of Transportation is requested to grant, without charge, an encroachment permit or permits, if required, authorizing an appropriate memorial plaque, funded by nonstate sources, to be placed within the right-of-way of State Highway Route 35 within the vicinity of the pedestrian beacon between Vale Avenue and Forest View Drive in San Francisco in memory of Hanren Chang, for view by pedestrians; and be it further Resolved, That the design and placement of the Memorial plaque shall be consistent with the standards of the Department of Transportation; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.