California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR121 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/13/2014

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 121INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Dahle MARCH 13, 2014 Relative to the CHP Officer Troy Lee Clark Memorial Bridge. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 121, as introduced, Dahle. CHP Officer Troy Lee Clark Memorial Bridge. This measure would designate the Spanish Creek Bridge in the County of Plumas as the CHP Officer Troy Lee Clark Memorial Bridge. The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources to cover that cost, to erect those signs. Fiscal committee: yes. WHEREAS, CHP Officer Troy Lee Clark was born on April 25, 1940 in Joshua Tree, California; and WHEREAS, Officer Clark graduated from Downey High School in 1958; and WHEREAS, Officer Clark married his high school sweetheart, Sharon Rita Johnsen, on July 6, 1958, and was just short of 54 years of marriage at the time of his passing; and WHEREAS, Officer Clark had six children, 17 grandchildren, and 9 great grandchildren; and WHEREAS, Officer Clark moved to the City of San Diego around 1960 and worked for the San Diego Police Department from 1960 to 1963, inclusive; and WHEREAS, Officer Clark entered the Department of California Highway Patrol Academy in 1963 and went to work for the department based in San Diego; and WHEREAS, Officer Clark was transferred to Quincy, California, in 1976 and retired from the department in 1979; and WHEREAS, Upon retirement, Officer Clark began a second career as an electrical contractor and was active in the trade until his passing on July 1, 2012, in Quincy; and WHEREAS, Officer Clark was also a member of the Quincy Volunteer Fire Department for over 30 years from 1977 until 2008 or 2009, attaining the rank of assistant chief; and WHEREAS, Officer Clark volunteered countless hours over the years in Quincy for the Plumas County Fair as its electrician; and WHEREAS, Officer Clark continued his volunteer work even after retiring and selling his contracting business; and WHEREAS, Officer Clark also volunteered as timekeeper for his grandson's basketball team at Quincy High School; and WHEREAS, In recognition of Officer Clark's contributions in serving the Department of the California Highway Patrol and the citizens of California, it would be fitting to designate the Spanish Creek Bridge in the County of Plumas in his honor; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designate the Spanish Creek Bridge on State Route 70, in the County of Plumas near Keddie, Bridge No. 09-0015, as the CHP Officer Troy Lee Clark Memorial Bridge; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of erecting appropriate signs, consistent with the signage requirements for the state highway system, showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.