California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1349 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/28/2014

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1349AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 28, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 27, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 23, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 9, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 26, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Senator Jackson (Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Bonilla) (Coauthors: Senators Correa and Hancock) FEBRUARY 21, 2014 An act to add Section 221.9 to the Education Code, relating to school athletics. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1349, as amended, Jackson. School athletics: information relating to competitive athletics. Existing law, known as the Sex Equity in Education Act, declares that it is the policy of the state that elementary and secondary school classes and courses, including nonacademic and elective classes and courses, be conducted without regard to the sex of the pupil enrolled in those classes and courses. The act also prohibits public funds from being used in connection with any athletic program conducted under the auspices of a school district governing board or any student organization within the district that does not provide equal opportunity to both sexes for participation and for use of facilities. This bill would express legislative findings and declarations relating to the participation of girls and women in competitive athletics. The bill would require, commencing with the 2015-16 school year and every year thereafter, each public elementary and secondary school in the state that offers competitive athletics, as defined, to make specified data publicly available at the end of the school year, and to post this information on the school's Internet Web site.  The bill would require the State Auditor, on July 1, 2019, and every 3 years thereafter, to choose 10 high schools that offer competitive athletics and audit each of those schools for full compliance with specified federal law. The bill would require the State Auditor, within 6 months of the applicable July 1, to report the results of the audit to various entities, including, among others, the audited schools, the Governor, and the Senate and Assembly Committees on Education.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee:  yes   no  . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The Legislature finds and declares all of the following: (a) Female pupils receive substantial benefits from participating in athletics, including physical benefits, psychological and emotional health benefits, learning responsible social behavior, and achieving greater academic success. The achievements of women in athletics is demonstrated by their performances in the Olympic Games, women's professional sports leagues, and other national and international women's sporting events that receive public attention. (b) In 1912, only 2 percent of Olympic athletes were women; in 2012, 44 percent of Olympians were women. (c) Between 1972 and 2011, the number of girls competing in high school sports jumped from under 295,000 to nearly 3,200,000. But the level of opportunity for girls still has not reached the level of opportunity for boys that existed when Title IX of the Education Amendments of 1972 to the Civil Rights Act of 1964 was enacted. (d) There are more women playing collegiate sports--about 200,000--than ever before. The number of female athletes at National Collegiate Athletic Association (NCAA) schools has increased from less than 30,000 to over 193,000 since 1972, but women still have over 60,000 fewer participation opportunities than their male counterparts. (e) Despite the fact that millions of women and girls are competing, they are unlikely to see athletic role models of their own gender in the media. Researchers from the University of California and Purdue University completed a 20-year study of sports coverage that shows the short shrift that women's sports receives compared to men's on network news and ESPN SportsCenter: in 2009, women's sports got only 1.6 percent of the airtime, down from 6.3 percent in 2004. (f) Unfortunately, Title IX has not managed to extend the social and health benefits of sports to all girls equally. In 2008, a national survey of pupils in grades 3 to 12, inclusive, by the Women' s Sports Foundation found that 75 percent of Caucasian girls play sports, compared to less than two-thirds of African American and Hispanic girls, and about one-half of Asian girls. And, while boys from immigrant families are well represented in youth sports, less than one-half of the girls from those families are playing sports. (g) The gender gap is also worse in urban schools and among kids from low-income families. These disparities in youth sports persist at the collegiate level. African American women are underrepresented in all sports except for Division I basketball and track and field, and Latinas make up just 4 percent of the female athletes in the NCAA. SEC. 2. Section 221.9 is added to the Education Code, to read: 221.9. (a) Commencing with the 2015-16 school year and every year thereafter, each public elementary and secondary school in the state that offers competitive athletics shall publicly make available at the end of the school year all of the following information: (1) The total enrollment of the school, classified by gender. (2) The number of pupils enrolled at the school who participate in competitive athletics, classified by gender. (3) The number of boys' and girls' teams, classified by sport and by competition level. (b) The data required pursuant to subdivision (a) shall reflect the total number of players on a team roster on the official first day of competition. (c) The school shall post the information specified in subdivision (a) on the school's Internet Web site. (d) The materials used by a school to compile the information specified in subdivision (a) shall be retained by the school for at least three years after the information is posted on the Internet pursuant to subdivision (c). (e) As used in this section, "competitive athletics" means sports where the activity has  coaches and   coaches,  a governing organization,  and  practices, and competes during a defined season, and has competition as its primary goal.  (f) (1) On July 1, 2019, and every three years thereafter, the State Auditor shall choose 10 high schools that offer competitive athletics, and shall audit each of the schools for full compliance with Title IX of the Education Amendments of 1972 (20 U.S.C. Sec. 1681 et seq.).   (2) The State Auditor shall, within six months of the applicable July 1, report the results of the audit required pursuant to paragraph (1) to the audited schools, the governing board of the school district of the audited schools, the department, the Governor, the Senate and Assembly Committees on Education, and the Senate and Assembly Judiciary Committees.   (3) The requirement for submitting a report pursuant to this subdivision is inoperative on January 1, 2024, pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code.