California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB139 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 06/17/2013

 BILL NUMBER: SB 139ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE APRIL 22, 2013 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JUNE 14, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Senator Hill JANUARY 29, 2013 An act to repeal Section 51015 of the Financial Code, relating to exchange facilitators. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 139, Hill. Exchange facilitators. Existing law regulates persons engaging in business as exchange facilitators, as defined, including requiring compliance with certain bonding and insurance requirements, imposing specified notification requirements, and prohibiting specified acts. Existing law makes any person who violates these provisions subject to civil suit in a court of competent jurisdiction, as provided. These provisions remain in effect until January 1, 2014, at which point they would be repealed by their own terms. This bill would remove the repeal date, thus continuing these provisions in effect indefinitely. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 51015 of the Financial Code is repealed.