BILL NUMBER: SB 1417INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Senator Jackson (Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Rodriguez) FEBRUARY 21, 2014 An act to amend Section 179.9 of the Government Code, relating to state government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1417, as introduced, Jackson. Emergency Management Assistance Compact. Existing law ratifies, approves, and sets forth the provisions of the Emergency Management Assistance Compact, an interstate agreement that provides for mutual assistance between states responding to emergencies and disasters. The compact becomes inoperative on March 1, 2015, and as of January 1, 2016, is repealed. This bill instead would make the compact inoperative on March 1, 2018, and repeal it on January 1, 2019. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 179.9 of the Government Code is amended to read: 179.9. This article shall become inoperative on March 1,2015,2018, and, as of January 1,2016, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that becomes operative on or before January 1, 2016, deletes or extends the dates on which it becomes inoperative and2019, is repealed.