California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1455 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/18/2014

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1455ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE MAY 28, 2014 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 14, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 27, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 6, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 9, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 26, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Senator DeSaulnier FEBRUARY 21, 2014 An act relating to public libraries. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1455, DeSaulnier. Public libraries: facilities: comprehensive needs assessment. Existing law establishes the California Library Construction and Renovation Bond Act of 1988 and the California Reading and Literacy Improvement and Public Library Construction and Renovation Bond Act of 2000. Existing law authorizes the issuance of bonds, pursuant to the State General Obligation Bond Law, in the amount of $72,405,000 in the 1988 bond act and in the amount of $350,000,000 in the 2000 bond act, for the purpose of financing public library construction and renovation. This bill would require the State Librarian, using existing resources, to prepare a comprehensive assessment on the statewide need for the new construction, renovation, and rehabilitation of public libraries and to submit a report to the Governor, the Department of Finance, the Legislative Analyst, and the appropriate policy and fiscal committees of the Legislature on or before August 15, 2015. The bill would make findings and declarations related to public libraries. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The Legislature finds and declares all of the following: (a) Reading and literacy skills are fundamental to success in our economy and our society. (b) Public libraries are a vital part of the educational system. They provide resources and services for all residents of California, including preschoolers, out-of-school adults, senior citizens, at-risk youth, and those attending schools at all levels. (c) In many cases, public libraries serve as a community's only public point of access to resources for learning and, by extension, self-sufficiency. (d) The construction and renovation of public library facilities is necessary to expand access to reading and literacy programs in the state public education system and to expand access to public library services for all residents of California. (e) The need for public library facilities continues to grow. A 2007 needs assessment compiled by the California State Library found that there is a need for over eight billion dollars ($8,000,000,000) in public library funding. (f) In March 2000, California voters approved a bond measure of three hundred fifty million dollars ($350,000,000) for public library construction and renovation. (g) Due to the overwhelming response by applicants, the California Public Library Construction and Renovation Board was forced to deny approximately 75 percent of all applications due to lack of additional bond funding. SEC. 2. (a) The State Librarian shall prepare a comprehensive assessment on the statewide need for the new construction, renovation, and rehabilitation of public libraries, and submit a report to the Governor, the Department of Finance, the Legislative Analyst, and the appropriate policy and fiscal committees of the Legislature on or before August 15, 2015. (b) The comprehensive assessment shall be prepared by the State Librarian using existing resources.