California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB208 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/28/2013

 BILL NUMBER: SB 208AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 28, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 11, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 14, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Senator Lara FEBRUARY 8, 2013 An act to add Section 4648.11 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to developmental services. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 208, as amended, Lara. Developmental services: request for proposals. Under existing law, the Lanterman Developmental Disabilities Services Act, the State Department of Developmental Services  is authorized to contract   contracts  with regional centers to provide services and supports to individuals with developmental disabilities. The services and supports to be provided to a regional center consumer are contained in an individual program plan (IPP), developed in accordance with prescribed requirements. Existing law authorizes the regional center to, among other things, solicit an individual or agency, by requests for proposals (RFPs) or other means, to provide needed services or supports that are not available to achieve the stated objectives of a consumer's IPP. This bill would  establish the Equity and Diversity in Developmental Services Act, and would  require a request for proposals that is prepared  by the department or  by a regional center  and that relates to   for  consumer programs or  services and supports to include a section on issues of equity and diversity, as specified. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee:  yes   no  . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The Legislature hereby finds and declares the following: (a) The State Department of Developmental Services and the regional center system provide treatment, habilitation, and other services to Californians with developmental disabilities so that they may lead more independent, productive, and integrated lives. (b) California, where diverse communities account for about 60 percent of the population, is now a "majority minority" state. (c) The Lanterman Developmental Disabilities Services Act requires that a person who receives services from a regional center must have programs, services, and supports that are "person centered" and that are based on the specific assessment and needs of each consumer. (d) Therefore, services provided to regional center consumers should be provided in a linguistically and culturally competent manner that promotes equity and diversity for all Californians. SEC. 2. Section 4648.11 is added to the Welfare and Institutions Code, to read:  4648.11. (a) This section shall be known and may be cited as the Equity and Diversity in Developmental Services Act. (b)   4648.11.   (   a)  A request for proposals that is prepared  by the department or  by a regional center  and that relates to   for  consumer  programs or  services and supports shall include a section on issues of equity and diversity.  (c)   (  b)  The section on equity and diversity shall request, but not be limited to, all of the following  information  : (1) A statement outlining the applicant's plan to serve diverse populations  , including, but not limited to, culturally and linguistically diverse populations  . (2) Examples of the applicant's commitment to addressing the needs of  those  diverse populations. (3) Any additional information that the applicant deems relevant to issues of equity and  diversity, including hiring bilingual staff, location of the program site, outreach strategies for underserved communities, and training and other materials in various languages and that are provided in a manner that is linguistically and culturally competent   diversity  .  (4) Nothing in this   (c)     This  section shall  not  alter contracts entered into  on or  before January 1, 2014.