California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB209 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/11/2013

 BILL NUMBER: SB 209INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Senator Lieu FEBRUARY 11, 2013 An act to amend Section 10752 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 209, as introduced, Lieu. Vehicle License Fee Law. The Vehicle License Fee Law, in lieu of an ad valorem property tax upon vehicles, imposes an annual license fee on specified vehicles subject to registration in this state in the amount of 0.65% of the market value of that vehicle, as provided. This bill would make technical, nonsubstantive changes to that provision. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 10752 of the Revenue and Taxation Code is amended to read: 10752. (a) The annual amount of the license fee for any vehicle, other than a trailer or semitrailer, as described in subdivision (a) of Section 5014.1 of the Vehicle Code or a commercial motor vehicle described in Section 9400.1 of the Vehicle Code, or a trailer coach that is required to be moved under permit as authorized in Section 35790 of the Vehicle Code, shall be a sum equal to the following percentage of the market value of the vehicle as determined by the department: (1) Sixty-five hundredths of 1 percent on and after January 1, 2005, and before May 19, 2009. (2) One percent for initial and renewal registrations due on and after May 19, 2009, but before July 1, 2011. (3) Sixty-five hundredths of 1 percent for initial and renewal registrations due on and after July 1, 2011. (b) The annual amount of the license fee for any commercial vehicle as described in Section 9400.1 of the Vehicle Code, shall be a sum equal to 0.65 percent of the market value of the vehicle as determined by the department. (c) Notwithstanding Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 11001) or any other law  to the contrary  , all revenues  (including penalties)   , including penalties  , less refunds, attributable to that portion of the rate imposed pursuant to this section in excess of 0.65 percent shall be deposited into the General Fund.