California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB242 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/23/2013

 BILL NUMBER: SB 242AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 23, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 1, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Senator Wyland  (   Coauthor:   Senator   DeSaulnier   )  FEBRUARY 12, 2013 An act to add  and repeal  Section 27567  to   of  the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 242, as amended, Wyland. Toll collection: alternative technologies. Existing law requires the Department of Transportation, in cooperation with the Golden Gate Bridge, Highway and Transportation District and all known entities planning to implement a toll facility, to develop and adopt functional specifications and standards for an automatic vehicle identification system, as specified, and generally requires any automatic vehicle identification system purchased or installed after January 1, 1991, to comply with those specifications and standards. Existing federal law, pursuant to the Moving Ahead for Progress in the 21st Century Act, requires all toll facilities on federal-aid highways to implement technologies or business practices that provide for the interoperability of electronic toll collection programs no later than a specified date. This bill would authorize the Department of Transportation and local and regional transportation agencies with existing or planned toll facilities to conduct a  market test of   pilot project that uses  automated toll collection technologies as an alternative to the existing radio-frequency identification tolling technology, in order to identify opportunities to facilitate lower cost tolling infrastructure, lower related operating costs, and more rapid deployment of high-occupancy toll lane networks. The bill would allow the test of tolling technologies that may not meet the interoperability requirements in existing law. The bill would authorize pilot projects in that regard for a period of up to 4 years  commencing January 1, 2014  . The bill would require any vendor participating in a pilot project to cover all  related  costs incurred by the participating agency  in operating the project  . The bill would require each participating agency to make a specified report  by June 1, 2018, to the chairpersons of the Senate Committee on Transportation and Housing and the Assembly Committee on Transportation, and   within 4 years of commencement of the pilot project  to the Governor  and the Legislature  . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 27567 is added to the Streets and Highways Code, to read: 27567. (a) The Department of Transportation, and local and regional transportation agencies with existing or planned toll facilities within their respective jurisdictions, may conduct a  market test of   pilot project   that uses  automated toll collection technologies as an alternative to the existing radio-frequency identification tolling technology, in order to identify opportunities to facilitate lower cost tolling infrastructure, lower related operating costs, and more rapid deployment of high-occupancy toll lane networks. Notwithstanding Section 27565  or any other provision of law, the test   pilot project  may include the deployment of tolling technology that may or may not meet interoperability requirements.  The agencies shall not be required to post any signs specific to the pilot project.  (b) The agencies referenced in subdivision (a) may undertake alternative tolling technology pilot projects in the state for a period of up to four  years, commencing January 1, 2014   years  . Any vendor electing to participate in a pilot project shall cover all  related  costs incurred by the state or local or regional transportation  agency in operating the pilot project,   agency,  including the cost of preparing and submitting the summary report required by subdivision (c). (c) Each agency that undertakes a pilot project pursuant to this section shall prepare a summary report that discusses the effectiveness of the technology, market performance, congestion management results, safety issues, implementation and related obstacles and opportunities, and other relevant factors. The summary report shall be submitted  on or before June 1, 2018, to the chairpersons of the Senate Committee on Transportation and Housing and the Assembly Committee on Transportation, and   within four years of commencing the pilot project  to the Governor  , and to the Legislature pursuant to Section 9795 of the Government Code  .  (d) An agency may only conduct a pilot project if it does not cause a reduction in federal aid highway funds as provided in Section 131 of Title 23 of the United States Code.   (e) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2018, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2018, deletes or extends that date.