California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB313 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/20/2013

 BILL NUMBER: SB 313ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE MAY 24, 2013 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 19, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 24, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Senator De Len (Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Alejo) (Coauthor: Senator Lieu) FEBRUARY 15, 2013 An act to add Section 3305.5 to the Government Code, relating to public employment. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 313, De Len. Public Safety Officers Procedural Bill of Rights Act. The Public Safety Officers Procedural Bill of Rights Act prohibits any punitive action, or denial of promotion on grounds other than merit, against a public safety officer, as defined, without providing the officer with specified administrative procedural protections, including, but not limited to, the officer's right to inspect his or her own personnel file and an opportunity for the officer to file an administrative appeal under certain conditions. This bill would prohibit a public agency from taking punitive action, or denying promotion on grounds other than merit, against a public safety officer, because the officer's name was placed on a "Brady list," as defined. The bill would further prohibit the introduction of any evidence in an administrative appeal of a punitive action that the officer's name was placed on a Brady list, except as provided. The bill would specifically not prohibit a public agency from taking punitive or personnel action against a public safety officer based on the underlying acts or omissions for which that officer's name was placed on the Brady list. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 3305.5 is added to the Government Code, to read: 3305.5. (a) A punitive action, or denial of promotion on grounds other than merit, shall not be undertaken by any public agency against any public safety officer because that officer's name has been placed on a Brady list, or that the officer's name may otherwise be subject to disclosure pursuant to Brady v. Maryland (1963) 373 U.S. 83. (b) This section shall not prohibit a public agency from taking punitive action, denying promotion on grounds other than merit, or taking other personnel action against a public safety officer based on the underlying acts or omissions for which that officer's name was placed on a Brady list, or may otherwise be subject to disclosure pursuant to Brady v. Maryland (1963) 373 U.S. 83, if the actions taken by the public agency otherwise conform to this chapter and to the rules and procedures adopted by the local agency. (c) Evidence that a public safety officer's name has been placed on a Brady list, or may otherwise be subject to disclosure pursuant to Brady v. Maryland (1963) 373 U.S. 83, shall not be introduced for any purpose in any administrative appeal of a punitive action, except as provided in subdivision (d). (d) Evidence that a public safety officer's name was placed on a Brady list may only be introduced if, during the administrative appeal of a punitive action against an officer, the underlying act or omission for which that officer's name was placed on a Brady list is proven and the officer is found to be subject to some form of punitive action. Evidence that a public safety officer's name was placed on a Brady list pursuant to this subdivision shall only be used for the sole purpose of determining the type or level of punitive action to be imposed. (e) For purposes of this section, "Brady list" means any system, index, list, or other record containing the names of peace officers whose personnel files are likely to contain evidence of dishonesty or bias, which is maintained by a prosecutorial agency or office in accordance with the holding in Brady v. Maryland (1963) 373 U.S. 83.