California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB359 Amended / Bill

Filed 09/12/2013

 BILL NUMBER: SB 359AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 12, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 6, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 1, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Senator Corbett  (   Principal   coauthors:   Assembly Members   Eggman  and Mullin   )  FEBRUARY 20, 2013 An act relating to  electric vehicles,   vehicular air pollution   ,  and making an appropriation therefor. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 359, as amended, Corbett.  Electric vehicles.   Vehicles: retirement and replacement.   Existing   (1)     Existing  law establishes the Air Quality Improvement Program that is administered by the State Air Resources Board for the purposes of funding projects related to, among other things, reduction of criteria air pollutants and improvement of air quality. Existing law requires, until January 1, 2016, that a portion of the registration fees for motor vehicles and vessels be deposited into the Air Quality Improvement Fund and, upon appropriation, be expended for the implementation of the program. Pursuant to the Air Quality Improvement Program, the state board has established the Clean Vehicle Rebate Project to promote the production and use of zero-emission vehicles and the Hybrid and Zero-Emission Truck and Bus Voucher Incentive Project to provide vouchers to help California fleets to purchase hybrid and zero-emission trucks and buses. Existing law establishes the Vehicle Inspection and Repair Fund, which serves as a repository for fees collected by the Department of Consumer Affairs pursuant to the Automotive Repair Act. This bill would require the  Controller, upon the order of the Director of Finance,   Controller  to transfer, as a loan, $30,000,000 from the Vehicle Inspection and Repair Fund to the Air Quality Improvement Fund. The bill would appropriate to the state board  $30,000,000 from   these moneys in  the Air Quality Improvement Fund  to be expended only  for the Clean Vehicle Rebate Project and the Hybrid and Zero-Emission Truck and Bus Voucher Incentive Project, thereby making an appropriation.  (2) Existing law establishes the Capital Access Loan Program for small businesses, administered by the California Pollution Control Financing Authority, by providing loans through participating financial institutions to qualifying small businesses, including financial assistance to businesses affected by the In-Use Bus and Truck Rule through the Heavy-Duty Vehicle Air Quality Loan Program.   This bill would require the Controller to transfer, as a loan, $10,000,000, from the Vehicle Inspection and Repair Fund to the Air Pollution Control Fund. The bill would appropriate to the state board these moneys in the Air Pollution Control Fund to be expended only for the Heavy-Duty Vehicle Air Quality Loan Program, thereby making an appropriation.   (3) Existing law creates the Enhanced Fleet Modernization Subaccount in the High Polluter Removal and Repair Account and makes available, upon appropriation, all money in the account to establish and implement the enhanced fleet modernization program, administered by the Bureau of Automotive Repair in the Department of Consumer Affairs.   This bill would appropriate $8,000,000 to the Bureau of Automotive Repair from the Enhanced Fleet Modernization Subaccount in the High Polluter Repair or Removal Account to be expended only for the purposes of the enhanced fleet modernization program, thereby making an appropriation.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: yes. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. (a) The sum of  thirty   twenty  million dollars  ($30,000,000)   ($20,000,000)  is hereby appropriated  from   to the State Air Resources Board from the moneys transferred from the Vehicle Inspection and Repair   Account to  the Air Quality Improvement Fund  to the State Air Resources Board   pursuant to subdivision (d) to be expended only  for the Clean Vehicle Rebate  Project and Hybrid and Zero-Emission Truck and Bus Voucher Incentive Project   Project,  established pursuant to Article 3 (commencing with Section 44274) of Chapter 8.9 of Part 5 of Division 26 of the Health and Safety Code.  (b) The sum of ten million dollars ($10,000,000) is hereby appropriated to the State Air Resources Board from the moneys transferred from the Vehicle Inspection and Repair Account to the Air Quality Improvement Fund pursuant to subdivision (d) to be expended only for the Hybrid and Zero-Emission Truck and Bus Voucher Incentive Project, established pursuant to Article 3 (commencing with Section 44274) of Chapter 8.9 of Part 5 of Division 26 of the Health and Safety Code.   (c) The sum of ten million dollars ($10,000,000) is hereby appropriated to the State Air Resources Board from the moneys transferred to the Air Pollution Control Fund pursuant to subdivision (e) to be expended only for the Heavy-Duty Vehicle Air Quality Loan Program, administered through the Capital Access Loan Program established pursuant to Article 8 (commencing with Section 44559) of Chapter 1 of Division 27 of the Health and Safety Code.   (b) Upon the order of the Director of Finance, the   (d)     The  sum of thirty million dollars ($30,000,000) shall be transferred by the  Controller,  Controller  as a loan from the Vehicle Inspection and Repair Fund to the Air Quality Improvement Fund. No later than June 30, 2016, the loan shall be repaid  , from a non-General Fund source, upon appropriation by the Legislature,  with interest at the rate earned by the Pooled Money Investment Account at the time of the transfer.  (e) The sum of ten million dollars ($10,000,000) shall be transferred by the Controller as a loan from the Vehicle Inspection and Repair Fund to the Air Pollution Control Fund. No later than June 30, 2021, the loan shall be repaid from the Air Pollution Control Fund with interest at the rate earned by the Pooled Money Investment Account at the time of the transfer.   SEC. 2.   The sum of eight million dollars ($8,000,000) is hereby appropriated to the Bureau of Automotive Repair in the Department of Consumer Affairs from the Enhanced Fleet Modernization Subaccount in the High Polluter Repair or Removal Account to be expended only for the purposes of Article 11 (commencing with Section 44125) of Chapter 5 of Part 5 of Division 26 of the Health and Safety Code.