BILL NUMBER: SB 363AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 2, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 1, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Senator Wright FEBRUARY 20, 2013 An act to amendSectionSections 25100 and 32015 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 363, as amended, Wright. Firearms: criminal storage : unsafe handguns: fees . (1) Existing law requires the Department of Justice to maintain a roster listing all pistols, revolvers, and other firearms capable of being concealed on the person that have been tested by a certified testing laboratory and have been determined not to be unsafe handguns. Existing law allows the department to charge manufacturers of firearms an annual fee not to exceed the costs of preparing, publishing, and maintaining the roster. This bill would require the annual fee, commencing on January 1, 2015, to be paid on January 1 of every year.Existing(2) Existing law, subject to exceptions, provides that the offense of criminal storage of a firearm is committed when a person who keeps any loaded firearm within any premises that are under the person's custody or control knows or reasonably should know that a child is likely to gain access to the firearm without the permission of the child's parent or legal guardian, and the child obtains access to the firearm and thereby causes death or injury to the child or any other person, as specified, or carries the firearm to a public place, or unlawfully displays or uses the firearm, as specified. This bill would expand these provisions to include the circumstance of when the person who keeps the firearm knows or reasonably should know that a person prohibited from owning or possessing a firearm or deadly weapon, as specified, is likely to gain access to the firearm, and that person gains access to the firearm and thereby causes death or injury to himself or herself or any other person, as specified, or carries the firearm to a public place, or unlawfully displays or uses the firearm, as specified. By expanding the scope of an existing crime, this bill would impose a state-mandated local program. The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that no reimbursement is required by this act for a specified reason. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 25100 of the Penal Code is amended to read: 25100. (a) Except as provided in Section 25105, a person commits the crime of "criminal storage of a firearm of the first degree" if all of the following conditions are satisfied: (1) The person keeps any loaded firearm within any premises that are under the person's custody or control. (2) The person knows or reasonably should know that a child is likely to gain access to the firearm without the permission of the child's parent or legal guardian, or that a person prohibited from possessing a firearm or deadly weapon pursuant to Section 8100 or 8103 of the Welfare and Institutions Code is likely to gain access to the firearm. (3) The child obtains access to the firearm and thereby causes death or great bodily injury to the child or any other person, or the person prohibited from possessing a firearm or deadly weapon pursuant to Section 8100 or 8103 of the Welfare and Institutions Code obtains access to the firearm and thereby causes death or great bodily injury to himself or herself or any other person. (b) Except as provided in Section 25105, a person commits the crime of "criminal storage of a firearm of the second degree" if all of the following conditions are satisfied: (1) The person keeps any loaded firearm within any premises that are under the person's custody or control. (2) The person knows or reasonably should know that a child is likely to gain access to the firearm without the permission of the child's parent or legal guardian, or that a person prohibited from possessing a firearm or deadly weapon pursuant to Section 8100 or 8103 of the Welfare and Institutions Code is likely to gain access to the firearm. (3) The child obtains access to the firearm and thereby causes injury, other than great bodily injury, to the child or any other person, or carries the firearm either to a public place or in violation of Section 417, or the person prohibited from possessing a firearm or deadly weapon pursuant to Section 8100 or 8103 of the Welfare and Institutions Code obtains access to the firearm and thereby causes injury, other than great bodily injury, to himself or herself or any other person, or carries the firearm either to a public place or in violation of Section 417. SEC. 2. Section 32015 of the Penal Code is amended to read: 32015. (a) On and after January 1, 2001, the Department of Justice shall compile, publish, and thereafter maintain a roster listing all of the pistols, revolvers, and other firearms capable of being concealed upon the person that have been tested by a certified testing laboratory, have been determined not to be unsafe handguns, and may be sold in this state pursuant to this part. The roster shall list, for each firearm, the manufacturer, model number, and model name. (b) (1) The department may charge every person in this state who is licensed as a manufacturer of firearms pursuant to Chapter 44 (commencing with Section 921) of Title 18 of the United States Code, and any person in this state who manufactures or causes to be manufactured, imports into the state for sale, keeps for sale, or offers or exposes for sale any pistol, revolver, or other firearm capable of being concealed upon the person in this state, an annual fee not exceeding the costs of preparing, publishing, and maintaining the roster pursuant to subdivision (a) and the costs of research and development, report analysis, firearms storage, and other program infrastructure costs necessary to implement Sections 31900 to 32110, inclusive. Commencing January 1, 2015, the annual fee shall be paid on January 1 of every year. (2) Any pistol, revolver, or other firearm capable of being concealed upon the person that is manufactured by a manufacturer who manufactures or causes to be manufactured, imports into the state for sale, keeps for sale, or offers or exposes for sale any pistol, revolver, or other firearm capable of being concealed upon the person in this state, and who fails to pay any fee required pursuant to paragraph (1), may be excluded from the roster. (3) If a purchaser has initiated a transfer of a handgun that is listed on the roster as not unsafe, and prior to the completion of the transfer, the handgun is removed from the roster of not unsafe handguns because of failure to pay the fee required to keep that handgun listed on the roster, the handgun shall be deliverable to the purchaser if the purchaser is not otherwise prohibited from purchasing or possessing the handgun. However, if a purchaser has initiated a transfer of a handgun that is listed on the roster as not unsafe, and prior to the completion of the transfer, the handgun is removed from the roster pursuant to subdivision (d) of Section 32020, the handgun shall not be deliverable to the purchaser.SEC. 2.SEC. 3. No reimbursement is required by this act pursuant to Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution because the only costs that may be incurred by a local agency or school district will be incurred because this act creates a new crime or infraction, eliminates a crime or infraction, or changes the penalty for a crime or infraction, within the meaning of Section 17556 of the Government Code, or changes the definition of a crime within the meaning of Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution.