California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB371 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 06/17/2013

 BILL NUMBER: SB 371CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 9 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JUNE 17, 2013 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JUNE 17, 2013 PASSED THE SENATE APRIL 29, 2013 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 30, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 10, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Senator De Len FEBRUARY 20, 2013 An act relating to the payment of claims against the state, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 371, De Len. Claims against the state: appropriation. Existing law requires the Attorney General to pay certain judgments against the state. This bill would appropriate $15,557,808 from the General Fund to the Attorney General to pay specific judgments. This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an urgency statute. Appropriation: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Fifteen million five hundred fifty-seven thousand eight hundred eight dollars ($15,557,808) is hereby appropriated from the General Fund to be allocated in accordance with the following schedule: (a) Forty thousand dollars ($40,000) to the Department of Justice to pay the settlement in Doe v. State of California, Los Angeles Superior Court Case No. BC445151. Any funds appropriated in excess of the amount required for the payment of this claim shall revert to the General Fund. (b) Fifteen million five hundred seventeen thousand eight hundred eight dollars ($15,517,808) to the Department of Justice to pay the settlement in Ragatz v. State of California (CalFire), Solano Superior Court, Case No. FCSO38995. Any funds appropriated in excess of the amount required for the payment of this claim shall revert to the General Fund. SEC. 2. This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are: In order to pay judgment and settlement claims against the state and end hardship to claimants as quickly as possible, it is necessary for this act to take effect immediately.