BILL NUMBER: SB 486AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 23, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 3, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 3, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 15, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Senator DeSaulnier (Coauthor: Senator Liu) FEBRUARY 21, 2013 An act to add Section 98 14523.5 to , and to repeal Section 14009 of, the Streets and Highways Government Code, relating to transportation. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 486, as amended, DeSaulnier. Department of Transportation: performance measurement benchmarks. Department of Transportation: goals and performance measures. Existing law provides that the Department of Transportation shall have full possession and control of the state highway system and specifies the duties and responsibilities of the department on various other transportation matters. Existing law requires the California Transportation Commission to, among other things, allocate transportation capital funds to specific projects. This bill would require the commission, on or before January 31, 2015, and every 4 years thereafter, and in consultation with the department, to develop and adopt specific goals for the department to achieve specified priorities relative to the operation of effective transportation systems, the maintenance of the state highway system, and the reduction of greenhouse gas emissions in the department's activities. The bill would require the commission, in consultation with the department, to identify performance measures in that regard and to include an evaluation of the department's progress in meeting the goals in the commission's annual report to the Legislature. Existing law requires the department, by June 30, 1994, to apply for federal funding to be used for conversion of data pertaining to the state highway system from paper storage to intelligent computer information, and to commence implementation of the conversion process within 6 months of receiving federal funding approval. This bill would repeal these provisions. Existing law establishes the Transportation Agency in state government with various duties and responsibilities. This bill would require the Secretary of the Transportation Agency, in consultation with the Director of Transportation, to identify+ performance measurement benchmarks on which the department would be required to report in specified areas, including, among others, enhancement of public safety and environmental sustainability. The bill would require the department to issue reports measuring the department's success in meeting these performance benchmarks and to compile and make these reports publicly available, including on the Internet Web site of the Transportation Agency. The bill would require the secretary or his or her designee, on or before July 1, 2014, and not less than quarterly thereafter, to report to the California Transportation Commission on the department's performance. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 14009 of the Government Code is repealed. 14009. (a) Not later than June 30, 1994, the department shall apply for federal funding to be used for a comprehensive, rapid conversion of data pertaining to the state highway system from paper storage to intelligent computer information. (b) Within six months of having its application for federal funding approved, the department shall commence implementation of the conversion process. SEC. 2. Section 14523.5 is added to the Government Code , to read: 14523.5. (a) No later than January 31, 2015, and every four years thereafter, the commission, in consultation with the department, shall develop and adopt specific goals for the department to achieve each of the following priorities: (1) The operation of effective transportation systems for moving people and goods between regions and through the state using, for example, traffic demand strategies and technology that do not require the addition of capacity. (2) The maintenance of the state's state highway system in a state of good repair. (3) The reduction of greenhouse gas emissions to the maximum extent feasible in all of the department's activities. (b) The commission, in consultation with the department, shall identify performance measures for each of the goals adopted pursuant to subdivision (a) and shall include an evaluation of the department' s progress toward meeting these goals in its annual report to the Legislature pursuant to Section 14535. The department shall comply with requests from the commission for information necessary to perform the required evaluation. SECTION 1. (a) The Legislature finds and declares all of the following: (1) The Department of Transportation, the largest entity of its kind in the nation, is responsible for maintaining a complex transportation system, including more than 50,000 state highway lane miles, 12,600 bridges, and thousands of related facilities. (2) The department faces significant challenges in maintaining this infrastructure, much of which is aging and in need of repair or rehabilitation. (3) In order for the department to effectively accomplish this mission and to meet its strategic goals of improved safety, enhanced mobility, efficient project delivery, effective stewardship, and quality services, it must establish public trust, which requires increased transparency, clear accountability, and effective performance measurement. (b) Therefore, it is the intent of the Legislature to establish an office within the Transportation Agency to assist the department in identifying or developing performance measurements that will effectively assess the department's progress toward its strategic goals, and to ensure that this information is provided clearly and transparently to the public on a regular basis. SEC. 2. Section 98 is added to the Streets and Highways Code, to read: 98. (a) For purposes of this section, the following terms shall have the following meanings: (1) "Agency" means the Transportation Agency. (2) "Commission" means the California Transportation Commission. (3) "Department" means the Department of Transportation. (4) "Director" means the Director of Transportation. (5) "Secretary" means the Secretary of Transportation. (b) The secretary, in consultation with the director, shall identify performance measurement benchmarks on which the department shall report in the following areas: (1) Enhancement of public safety. (2) System preservation and rehabilitation. (3) Efficiency and cost-effectiveness of project delivery. (4) Environmental sustainability. (c) The department shall issue reports that measure the department' s success in meeting, at a minimum, the performance measurement benchmarks identified pursuant to subdivision (b). The department shall compile and make publicly available, including on the Internet Web site of the agency, the reports issued during each three-month reporting period. (d) On or before July 1, 2014, and not less than quarterly thereafter, the secretary or his or her designee shall report to the commission on the department's performance, based on the reports made by the department pursuant to this section.