California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB511 Amended / Bill

Filed 01/22/2014

 BILL NUMBER: SB 511AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JANUARY 22, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE JANUARY 6, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 30, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 1, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Senator Lieu FEBRUARY 21, 2013 An act to add Chapter 2.6 (commencing with Section 13996.85) to Part 4.7 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to state government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 511, as amended, Lieu. Trade promotion of California ports. Existing law requires the Director of the Governor's Office of Business and Economic Development to provide to the Legislature, not later than February 1, 2014, a strategy for international trade and investment that, at a minimum, includes specified information, goals, objectives, and actions related to the promotion of trade. The bill would require the director to convene, no later than February 1, 2015, a statewide business partnership for  the  promotion of trade for California ports and to explore greater utilization of California ports, that would be required to advise the director  on establishing a trade strategy  for those purposes, as prescribed. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Chapter 2.6 (commencing with Section 13996.85) is added to Part 4.7 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, to read: CHAPTER 2.6. TRADE PROMOTION OF CALIFORNIA PORTS 13996.85. The Director of the Governor's Office of Business and Economic Development shall convene, no later than February 1, 2015, a statewide business partnership for promotion of trade for California ports and to explore greater utilization of California ports, as follows: (a) The business partnership shall include, but is not limited to, representatives from ports of entry, ocean carriers, marine terminal operators, warehouse operators, railroads, trucking companies, labor representatives, and foreign trade zones, representatives of environmental groups, and shippers, specifically including agricultural exporters, manufacturers, postconsumer secondary material handlers, and retailers. (b) The business partnership shall advise the Director of the Governor's Office of Business and Economic Development on  establishing the strategy for  promoting trade for California ports while increasing the use of California ports of entry, and ways to increase the opportunity for growth and trade activity.