California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB552 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/03/2013

 BILL NUMBER: SB 552ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 30, 2013 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 26, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 6, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Senator Calderon FEBRUARY 22, 2013 An act to add Sections 51210.5 and 51220.3 to the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 552, Calderon. Pupil instruction: violence awareness. Existing law requires the adopted course of study for grades 1 to 6, inclusive, to include instruction in specified areas of study and requires the adopted course of study for grades 7 to 12, inclusive, to offer courses in specified areas of instruction. This bill would allow all required areas of study specified for those grades, as deemed appropriate by the governing board, to include grade-level appropriate instruction on violence awareness and prevention, including personal testimony in the form of oral or video histories. The bill would specify that it is the intent of the Legislature that the measure be carried out in a manner that does not result in new duties or programs being imposed on a school district. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 51210.5 is added to the Education Code, to read: 51210.5. The instruction in all areas of study specified in subdivisions (a) to (g), inclusive, of Section 51210 as deemed appropriate by the governing board and consistent with the adopted course of study for each subject area, may include grade-level appropriate instruction on violence awareness and prevention, which may include personal testimony in the form of oral or video histories that illustrate the economic and cultural effects of violence within a city, the state, and the country. SEC. 2. Section 51220.3 is added to the Education Code, to read: 51220.3. The instruction in all areas of study specified in subdivisions (a) to (j), inclusive, of Section 51220 as deemed appropriate by the governing board and consistent with the adopted course of study for each subject area, may include grade-level appropriate instruction on violence awareness and prevention, which may include personal testimony in the form of oral or video histories that illustrate the economic and cultural effects of violence within a city, the state, and the country. SEC. 3. It is the intent of the Legislature that this measure be carried out in a manner that does not result in new duties or programs being imposed on school districts. In this regard, the Legislature finds and declares that this measure does not mandate costs to local agencies or school districts, and that materials used to comply with the provisions of this bill shall be a part of materials purchased in a school district's regular course of business and purchasing cycles.