California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB672 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/05/2013

 BILL NUMBER: SB 672AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 5, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 28, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 11, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Senator Leno FEBRUARY 22, 2013 An act to add Section 18901.1 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to CalFresh. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 672, as amended, Leno. CalFresh: eligibility: guidelines. Existing federal law provides for the federal Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP), under which nutrition assistance benefits are allocated to each state by the federal government. Under existing state law, the CalFresh program, California's federal allocation is distributed to eligible individuals by each county. Existing law requires that the eligibility of households be determined to the extent permitted by federal law, and requires the State Department of Social Services to establish a program of categorical eligibility for CalFresh in accordance with federal law. Existing law requires each county welfare department to carry out the local administrative responsibilities of this program, subject to the supervision of the department and to rules and regulations adopted by the department. This bill would require the department to issue guidance to simplify the verification of dependent care expense deductions necessary to determine eligibility for, or the benefit level of, CalFresh  , to the extent permitted by federal law  . The bill would require that the guidance establish that dependent care expenses shall be considered verified upon receipt of a self-certified statement of monthly  dependent care  expenses, unless federal law requires, or the county human services agency requests, additional documentation, as specified.  The bill would authorize the department to implement these provisions by all-county letters or similar instructions until regulations are adopted, and would require the department to adopt regulations on or before January 1, 2015.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. It is the intent of the Legislature to support an increase in CalFresh benefits for low-income working families  by using state options, including the option provided in Section 273.2 of Title 7 of the Code of Federal Regulations, to increase eligibility for families  by simplifying the verification of  their  dependent care expenses. SEC. 2. Section 18901.1 is added to the Welfare and Institutions Code, to read: 18901.1. (a) The department shall issue guidance to simplify the verification of dependent care expense deductions necessary to determine  a household's  eligibility for, or the benefit level of, CalFresh  , to the extent permitted by federal law  . The guidance shall establish that dependent care expenses shall be considered verified upon receipt of a self-certified statement of monthly  dependent care  expenses, unless federal law or guidance requires additional documentation. (b) This section shall not preclude the county human services agency from requesting additional documentation to verify a dependent care expense deduction if the verification received is questionable.  (c) Notwithstanding the rulemaking provisions of the Administrative Procedure Act (Chapter 3.5 (commencing with Section 11340) of Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code), until regulations are adopted, the department may implement this section through all-county letters or similar instructions. The department shall adopt regulations implementing this section on or before January 1, 2015.