California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB806 Amended / Bill

Filed 07/03/2013

 BILL NUMBER: SB 806AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 3, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 14, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 23, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 1, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Senator Hueso FEBRUARY 22, 2013 An act to amend Section 4853 of the Vehicle Code, relating to the Department of Motor Vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 806, as amended, Hueso. Department of Motor Vehicles: license plate alternatives pilot program. Existing law authorizes the Department of Motor Vehicles to issue license plates for vehicles, as specified, and to issue one or more stickers, tabs, or other suitable devices in lieu of the license plates, as specified. This bill would authorize the department to establish a pilot program  , to be completed no later than January 1, 2017,  to evaluate the use of alternatives to stickers, tabs, license plates, and registration cards, subject to certain requirements. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 4853 of the Vehicle Code is amended to read: 4853. (a) The department may issue one or more stickers, tabs, or other suitable devices in lieu of the license plates provided for under this code. Except where the physical differences between the stickers, tabs, or devices and license plates by their nature render the provisions of this code inapplicable, all provisions of this code relating to license plates may apply to stickers, tabs, or devices. (b) The department may establish a pilot program to evaluate the use of alternatives to the stickers, tabs, license plates, and registration cards authorized by this code, subject to all of the following requirements: (1) The alternative products shall be approved by the Department of the California Highway Patrol. (2) The pilot program shall be limited to no more than 0.5 percent of registered vehicles for the purpose of road testing and evaluation. (3) The alternative products to be evaluated shall be provided at no cost to the state. (4)  The   Any  pilot program  established by the department pursuant to this subdivision  shall be completed no later than January 1, 2017.