BILL NUMBER: SB 807CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 170 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 27, 2013 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR AUGUST 27, 2013 PASSED THE SENATE MAY 9, 2013 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 8, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Senator Price (Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Hall) (Coauthor: Senator Wright) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Bradford, Brown, Holden, Jones-Sawyer, Mitchell, and Weber) FEBRUARY 22, 2013 An act relating to postsecondary education. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 807, Price. California State University: African American Political and Economic Institute. Existing law establishes the California State University and its various campuses under the administration of the Trustees of the California State University. Statutory provisions that were repealed on January 1, 2010, authorized the trustees to establish an African American Political and Economic Institute at California State University, Dominguez Hills. This bill would require California State University, Dominguez Hills, to rename the African American Political and Economic Institute as the Mervyn M. Dymally African American Political and Economic Institute. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The California State University, Dominguez Hills shall rename its African American Political and Economic Institute as the Mervyn M. Dymally African American Political and Economic Institute.