California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB811 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/28/2013

 BILL NUMBER: SB 811AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 28, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 6, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 3, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Senator Lara FEBRUARY 22, 2013 An act to add Section 103.1 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 811, as amended, Lara. State Highway Route 710. Existing law provides that the Department of Transportation has full possession and control of the state highway system. Existing law imposes various requirements for the development and implementation of transportation projects. This bill would impose various additional requirements on the department, or on another agency, if that agency agrees to assume responsibility as the lead agency with respect to the I-710 expansion project in the County of Los Angeles from State Highway Route 60 in East Los Angeles to Ocean Boulevard in Long Beach. The bill would require the lead agency, in consultation with all interested community organizations, to consider, within the environmental review process for the project, alternatives to address the air quality, public health, and mobility impacts the project will have on neighboring communities. The bill would require the final environmental document approved by the lead agency to include an investment in identified mitigation measures for the affected communities  of not less than 10 percent of the total project costs.   and the Los Angeles River   .  The bill would require the lead agency to submit a report in that regard to the Legislature at least 90 days prior to approving the final environmental document for the project. The bill would make legislative findings and declarations. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 103.1 is added to the Streets and Highways Code, to read: 103.1. (a) As used in this section, the following terms have the following meanings: (1) "I-710 expansion project" means the proposed program of improvements to the State Highway Route 710 Corridor in the County of Los Angeles within the State Highway Route 710 Corridor project study area, which extends from State Highway Route 60 in East Los Angeles to Ocean Boulevard in Long Beach. The I-710 expansion project does not include any extension of State Highway Route 710 through South Pasadena from State Highway Route 10 to State Highway Route 210. (2) "Lead agency" means the department, unless another agency agrees to assume responsibility as the lead agency for the I-710 expansion project under the California Environmental Quality Act (Division 13 (commencing with Section 21000) of the Public Resources Code), in which case "lead agency" means that other agency. (3) "Los Angeles River" or "river" means the Los Angeles River within the State Highway Route 710 Corridor project study area, including the adjacent tributaries of Compton Creek and Rio Hondo. (b) The Legislature finds and declares that the proposed I-710 expansion project is a project of national significance that is intended to expand capacity on State Highway Route 710 in the County of Los Angeles to accommodate the movement of freight from and to the ports of Los Angeles and Long Beach, thereby providing economic benefits in the region and beyond. However, the I-710 expansion project, as proposed, will have adverse public health, air quality, and quality-of-life impacts on residents residing near the corridor from East Los Angeles to Long Beach. (c) The lead agency, in consultation with all interested community organizations, shall consider, within the environmental review process, alternatives to address the air quality, public health, and mobility impacts the I-710 expansion project will have on neighboring communities. (d) The final environmental document approved by the lead agency for the I-710 expansion project shall include an investment in identified mitigation measures for the affected communities  , including   and  the Los Angeles  River, of not less than 10 percent of the total project costs   River  . (e) At least 90 days prior to approving the final environmental document for the I-710 expansion project, the lead agency shall submit a report to the Legislature describing the identified mitigation measures that will be included in the project and providing evidence of meeting the requirements of this section. The report shall be submitted pursuant to Section 9795 of the Government Code.