California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB898 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/25/2014

 BILL NUMBER: SB 898ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 21, 2014 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 20, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 18, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 7, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 25, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 6, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Senator Cannella (Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Gray) (Coauthors: Senators Huff, Gaines, and Vidak) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Allen, Chvez, Jones, Maienschein, Olsen, and Waldron) JANUARY 13, 2014 An act to add Section 16301.3 to the Government Code, relating to state government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 898, Cannella. State government: state funds. Under existing law, all moneys in the possession of or collected by any state agency or department is state moneys and is subject to provisions governing its deposit and handling in trust accounts. Existing law creates the State Treasury System to deposit state moneys held by state agencies prior to expenditure. This bill would require each state agency, department, and entity to provide the Treasurer with its employer identification number. The bill would authorize the Treasurer to use those numbers to monitor state money deposited outside the centralized State Treasury System. The bill would also require a bank or financial institution to provide, upon request from the Treasurer, specified account information relating to these employer identification numbers to assist the Treasurer in monitoring accounts and state money deposited outside the centralized State Treasury System. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 16301.3 is added to the Government Code, to read: 16301.3. (a) Each state agency, department, and entity shall provide its employer identification number to the Treasurer. The Treasurer is authorized to use these employer identification numbers to monitor state money deposited outside of the centralized State Treasury System. (b) Notwithstanding any other provision of law, a bank or financial institution shall, upon request from the Treasurer, provide to the Treasurer the account number, account balance, account owner of record, account type, account opening date, account closing date, and account purpose, if known, associated with the employer identification numbers described in subdivision (a), to assist the Treasurer in monitoring accounts and state money deposited outside of the centralized State Treasury System.