BILL NUMBER: SCR 110CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 76 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JUNE 26, 2014 ADOPTED IN SENATE JUNE 23, 2014 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 19, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 14, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Senator Hernandez APRIL 10, 2014 Relative to Korean War Remembrance Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 110, Hernandez. Korean War Remembrance Week. This measure would recognize the 4th calendar week of June in 2014, and each 4th calendar week in June thereafter, as Korean War Remembrance Week. WHEREAS, The Korean War was initiated by the North Korean People's Army on June 25, 1950, at 4:30 a.m., when it crossed the 38th Parallel and invaded the Republic of Korea with 135,000 soldiers; and WHEREAS, Thirty-three thousand six hundred eighty-six members of the United States Armed Forces died in battle during the 36 months the war raged, another 8,176 were declared missing in action, and thousands more were wounded by enemy fire, and some 2,611 Californians died in the fierce fighting that was the Korean War; and WHEREAS, Each June 25th is known in the State of California, its counties, and its cities as United States Korean War Veterans Day in formal recognition by this state of the patriotism, valor, fidelity, and sacrifices of the members of the California National Guard, the United States Army, the United States Marines, the United States Navy, the United States Coast Guard, the United States Air Force, and federal and state reserve personnel; and WHEREAS, It is essential to aid in any way the men and women who served and died or were wounded or incapacitated during the Korean War, and perpetuate the memory of those whose lives were sacrificed in our wars; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the fourth calendar week in June 2014, and each fourth calendar week of June hereafter, is hereby designated and commemorated as Korean War Remembrance Week; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.