BILL NUMBER: SCR 119ENROLLED BILL TEXT ADOPTED IN SENATE JUNE 26, 2014 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 21, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 3, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Senator Fuller MAY 12, 2014 Relative to the CHP Officer Gerald N. Harris Memorial Interchange. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 119, Fuller. CHP Officer Gerald N. Harris Memorial Interchange. This measure would designate the Interchange at State Route 99 and eastbound State Route 58 in the County of Kern as the CHP Officer Gerald N. Harris Memorial Interchange. The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost for appropriate signs, that shall include the star of the Department of the California Highway Patrol, showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, Officer Gerald Nathan Harris was born on November 19, 1938, to Sam and Juanita Harris, in the City of Bakersfield, California, and had four siblings: Alan, JoAnn, Melvin, and Phillip; and WHEREAS, Officer Harris graduated from North High School in 1957, and enlisted in the United States Marine Corps shortly thereafter. After several years of service, he was honorably discharged on December 5, 1965; and WHEREAS, Officer Harris married the love of his life, Sherril, on August 25, 1961, and had a wonderful daughter, Holly, born December 31, 1965, whom he treasured dearly; and WHEREAS, Officer Harris was a service salesman employed by Three Way Chevrolet prior to becoming a California Highway Patrol Officer; and WHEREAS, Officer Harris graduated from the Department of the California Highway Patrol Academy in 1967 with Academy Class CTC-IV-67, and was assigned to the Santa Fe Springs Area, where he served for approximately one year before being transferred to the Bakersfield Area, where he spent the remainder of his career; and WHEREAS, Officer Harris, badge number 5554, was killed in the line of duty on February 27, 1974, while directing traffic at an intersection in the City of Bakersfield, where he was struck by a hit-and-run driver; and WHEREAS, The impact of the collision left Officer Harris with a broken leg and other injuries, which, at the time, did not appear to be life threatening; and WHEREAS, When Officer Harris subsequently required special medical treatment, the president of Continental Telephone in the City of Bakersfield volunteered his company's medical plane to take him to a hospital in San Francisco for special treatment, but Officer Harris, unfortunately, died shortly thereafter from an embolism; and WHEREAS, Officer Harris is survived by his wife, Sherril, his daughter, Holly, and two siblings, Alan and Melvin, and two grandchildren, Tyler, born February 13, 1991, and Christian, born June 9, 1994; and WHEREAS, Officer Harris was a hardworking, dedicated officer who loved his job and enjoyed the people with whom he worked, and who, throughout his career, received several letters commending him on his exemplary service, including one from then Wasco Chief of Police, Robert Duke, and several thank you letters from those whose lives he saved or changed dramatically; and WHEREAS, Officer Harris was good natured, gracious, honest and loyal, and would always go out of his way to help those in need. In his spare time, he enjoyed weight lifting, the Police Olympics, softball, volunteering to teach bicycle safety to children in schools, and spending time with his family and friends; and WHEREAS, In recognition of Officer Harris's great contributions and sacrifice in serving the Department of the California Highway Patrol and the citizens of California, it would be fitting to designate the Interchange at State Route 99 and eastbound State Route 58 in the County of Kern, California, in his honor; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the Interchange at State Route 99 and eastbound State Route 58 in the County of Kern as the CHP Officer Gerald N. Harris Memorial Interchange; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of erecting appropriate signs, that shall include the star of the Department of the California Highway Patrol, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering the cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.