California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR123 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 06/26/2014

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 123ENROLLED BILL TEXT ADOPTED IN SENATE JUNE 9, 2014 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 26, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Senator Wyland MAY 21, 2014 Relative to Voter Awareness Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 123, Wyland. Voter Awareness Week. This measure would proclaim the week of September 21 through September 27, 2014, as Voter Awareness Week. WHEREAS, an essential part of an effective democracy is the opportunity for all eligible people to register and to vote; and WHEREAS, California's voter turnout among young adults is low compared to that of other states; it was only 41.6 percent in the 2012 presidential election; and WHEREAS, Californians under the age of 25 increased their registration rates by 8 percent in 2012; and WHEREAS, Young adults who are provided with practical information about voting feel more prepared to participate and become active, engaged citizens who will benefit California's political climate in the future; and WHEREAS, While most youth voter outreach efforts target college students, there is a tremendous gap in registration and turnout rates between young adults with college experience and those without; and WHEREAS, Young adults are the best resource available to encourage other young adults to register and to vote; and WHEREAS, Involving young adults in civic education opportunities, activities, and discussion can increase the likelihood that others in their households will vote; and WHEREAS, People who begin voting at a younger age are more likely to vote consistently later in life; and WHEREAS, As young adults comprise a larger portion of the voting population than the baby boomers, it is necessary to encourage the youth of our state to participate in the democratic system in order to train and prepare the next generation of political and civic leaders; and WHEREAS, California has the opportunity to boost registration rates among young adults through the use of its online voter registration application, launched in 2012, which young adults prefer to the traditional voter registration application; and WHEREAS, A primary purpose of California's schools is to prepare students to become active citizens; and WHEREAS, There is an ongoing need to increase youth civic participation; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims the week of September 21 through 27, 2014, as Voter Awareness Week; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature encourages all of California's public schools to participate in Voter Awareness Week activities; and be it further Resolved, that the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.