BILL NUMBER: SCR 125ENROLLED BILL TEXT ADOPTED IN SENATE JUNE 26, 2014 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 21, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Senator Corbett MAY 29, 2014 Relative to the CHP Officers Frederick Wayne Enright and Adolfo Martinez Hernandez Memorial Bridge. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 125, Corbett. CHP Officers Frederick Wayne Enright and Adolfo Martinez Hernandez Memorial Bridge. This measure would designate a portion of Interstate 680 in the County of Alameda as the CHP Officers Frederick Wayne Enright and Adolfo Martinez Hernandez Memorial Bridge. The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost for appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, California Highway Patrol Officers Frederick Wayne Enright and Adolfo Martinez Hernandez made the ultimate sacrifice while performing their sworn duty and, in recognition thereof, we pay special tribute to their bravery and dedication; and WHEREAS, On June 27, 1975, the state suffered a tragic loss when Officers Enright and Hernandez were killed in a helicopter crash caused by mechanical failure; and WHEREAS, Officer Frederick Wayne Enright was born August 27, 1944, to Francis Xavier and Mary Alice, in Louisiana, Missouri; and WHEREAS, Officer Enright graduated from Canoga Park High School in Canoga Park, California, in 1962 and within one year after graduation earned his Private Pilot License in Rotary Wing; and WHEREAS, Before joining the Department of the California Highway Patrol, Officer Enright worked at Von's Grocery Store, and attended the Los Angeles Police Academy; and WHEREAS, Officer Enright served in the United States Army from July 26, 1965, to January 31, 1970, during which time he achieved the ranks of Chief Warrant Officer 2 and Army Aviator; and WHEREAS, Officer Enright married his best friend, Sheila Frances Liddell, in July of 1968 and had a wonderful daughter, Robyn Alise, born October 19, 1973; and WHEREAS, Officer Enright, badge number 7857, graduated from the Department of the California Highway Patrol Academy in March of 1972 with the Cadet Training Class V-71, and upon graduation he was assigned to the West Valley Area; and WHEREAS, After only six months with the Department of the California Highway Patrol, Officer Enright achieved the rank of Pilot and was transferred to the Golden Gate Division in the San Francisco Bay Area; and WHEREAS, As a helicopter pilot, Officer Enright responded to numerous land and water rescue operations and routinely flew commute traffic observation for bay area highways and freeways; and WHEREAS, During one of Officer Enright's patrols, he encountered a drunk pilot, ordered him to land, and escorted him to the ground, where the pilot was arrested. Not only was this a dangerous encounter, but Officer Enright's helicopter suffered power failure and he successfully landed it without damage or injury. The Department of the California Highway Patrol subsequently commended Officer Enright for his exceptional skill and decisionmaking during this incident; and WHEREAS, Officer Enright was a hard-working, dedicated officer who loved his job and enjoyed the people who worked with him. He was known for being a loyal family man and a wonderful father and husband; and WHEREAS, Officer Enright's greatest joys were his wife and daughter. He had an incredible optimism, a great sense of adventure, and enthusiasm for life. In his spare time, he enjoyed listening to music, fishing, skiing, sports cars, motorcycles, and boating; and WHEREAS, Officer Enright is admired by all who knew him for his dedication to serving others and for a life well lived; and WHEREAS, Officer Enright was survived by his wife, Sheila, daughter, Robyn, brothers, Terrence and Frank III, and sister, Rosemary; and WHEREAS, Officer Adolfo Martinez Hernandez was born September 27, 1940, to Tiburcio and Juana in Etiwanda, California, and was one of 12 children; and WHEREAS, Although Officer Hernandez grew up poor, and oftentimes had to do his homework on an ironing board, he was determined to get an education. He graduated from Fontana High School in 1959 and attended Chaffey Community College; and WHEREAS, Officer Hernandez held several jobs before joining the Department of the California Highway Patrol, including working in the laboratory at Etiwanda Steel Plant; and WHEREAS, Officer Hernandez served in the United States Army from July 30, 1962, to June 30, 1968, and achieved the rank of Private First Class; and WHEREAS, Officer Adolfo Martinez Hernandez married the love of his life, Genevieve Catherine Gonzales, on June 24, 1967, and had two wonderful children, Lisa Mercedes, born October 21, 1972, and Sebastian Heriberto, born May 10, 1974; and WHEREAS, Officer Hernandez, badge number 4876, graduated from the Department of the California Highway Patrol Academy in 1966, and proudly served the residents of California for nine years; and WHEREAS, Officer Hernandez was a devoted officer, husband, and father and was known for his big heart and immense love for his family and friends, even when some of them were "unlovable"; and WHEREAS, In addition to spending time with his children, Officer Hernandez enjoyed motorcycles, refurbishing a VW van, making wood carvings, and creating leather items, such as wallets, handbags, sandals, belts, and a special holder for his California Highway Patrol badge. He also loved "do-it-yourself" projects and built a bicycle seat for his then two-year-old daughter, a bike rack for his car, and a bookcase and small end table that his son still has in his home today; and WHEREAS, Officer Hernandez was admired for his devotion to his family, his silly jokes, his commitment to duty and the residents of California, his faithfulness, his honesty and integrity, his pride in his Mexican heritage, and for the overall love and admiration he had for his children; and WHEREAS, Officer Hernandez beamed when he introduced his children to others as if he were the sole source in creating such miracles; and WHEREAS, Officer Hernandez is survived by his wife, Genevieve, his two children, Lisa and Sebastian, his grandchildren, Isaiah Ishmael and Solomon Xavier, and his siblings, Manual, George, Raymond, Anna, Armando, Marcelena, Victor, Louie, and Magdalena; and WHEREAS, In recognition of the contributions and sacrifice of officers Frederick Wayne Enright and Adolfo Martinez Hernandez in serving the Department of the California Highway Patrol and the residents of California, it would be fitting to designate a portion of Interstate 680 in Alameda County as the CHP Officers Frederick Wayne Enright and Adolfo Martinez Hernandez Memorial Bridge in their honor; and WHEREAS, Through adoption of Assembly Concurrent Resolution 100 (Resolution Chapter Number 109, Statutes of 2012), the Legislature designated the Grimmer Boulevard Bridge in the City of Fremont, County of Alameda, on Interstate 680 in memory of Officers Enright and Hernandez; and WHEREAS, The Legislature now desires, instead, to designate a portion of Interstate 680 at Auto Mall Parkway in the County of Alameda in memory of Officers Enright and Hernandez; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the Interstate 680 bridge that crosses Auto Mall Parkway in the County of Alameda as the CHP Officers Frederick Wayne Enright and Adolfo Martinez Hernandez Memorial Bridge; and be it further Resolved, That the designation in memory of Officers Enright and Hernandez made by Assembly Concurrent Resolution 100 (Resolution Chapter Number 109, Statutes of 2012) is hereby rescinded; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the costs of erecting the appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering the cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.