BILL NUMBER: SCR 39ENROLLED BILL TEXT ADOPTED IN SENATE MAY 6, 2013 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 22, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Senator Correa (Coauthors: Senators Anderson, Beall, Block, Cannella, Corbett, De Len, DeSaulnier, Evans, Fuller, Gaines, Hancock, Huff, Knight, Leno, Lieu, Liu, Monning, Nielsen, Pavley, Steinberg, Walters, Wolk, Wyland, and Yee) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Ammiano, Buchanan, Ian Calderon, Chesbro, Daly, Donnelly, Frazier, Gomez, Gordon, Harkey, Maienschein, Olsen, Ting, Wagner, Waldron, and Yamada) APRIL 23, 2013 Relative to peace officers. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 39, Correa. California Peace Officers' Memorial Day. This measure would designate Monday, May 6, 2013, as California Peace Officers' Memorial Day, urge all Californians to use that day to honor California peace officers, and recognize specified California peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities. WHEREAS, Monday, May 6, 2013, is California Peace Officers' Memorial Day, a day Californians observe in commemoration of those noble officers who have tragically sacrificed their lives in the line of duty; and WHEREAS, Although the people of this state are indebted to our California peace officers each day of the week, we make particular note of their bravery and dedication and we share in their losses on California Peace Officers' Memorial Day; and WHEREAS, California peace officers have a job second in importance to none, and it is a job that is as difficult and dangerous as it is important; and WHEREAS, The peace officers of California have worked dutifully and selflessly on behalf of the people of this great state, regardless of the peril or hazard to themselves; and WHEREAS, By the enforcement of our laws, these same officers have safeguarded the lives and property of the people of this state and have given their full measure to ensure Californians the right to be free from crime and violence; and WHEREAS, Special ceremonies and observations on behalf of California peace officers provide all Californians with the opportunity to appreciate the heroic men and women who have dedicated their lives to preserving public safety; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That California's peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities be recognized: Deputy Robert L. Paris, Jr., Stanislaus County Sheriff's Department, End of Watch: April 12, 2012. Officer Kenyon M. Youngstrom, California Highway Patrol, Contra Costa, End of Watch: September 5, 2012; and be it further Resolved, That California's peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities in prior years, but not yet enrolled, also be recognized: Officer Daniel C. Clark, San Bernardino Police Department, End of Watch: November 3, 2011. Inspector Brian D. Olcomendy, San Francisco Police Department, End of Watch: July 26, 2003. Officer Robert J. Quirk, California Highway Patrol, Red Bluff, End of Watch: April 11, 1971. Sheriff William Elam, Placer County Sheriff's Department, End of Watch: October 1, 1951. Deputy Constable Arthur D. Miner, Butte County Sheriff's Department, End of Watch: October 24, 1934. Officer Timothy Duane, Oakland Police Department, End of Watch: April 18, 1930. Deputy Constable J. Edward Brown, Los Angeles County Sheriff's Department, End of Watch: September 14, 1924. Deputy Ray C. Bogart, Lassen County Sheriff's Department, End of Watch: January 11, 1915. Deputy Constable Charles A. DeMoranville, Los Angeles County Sheriff's Department, End of Watch: January 4, 1909. Deputy William F. Edwards, Mono County Sheriff's Department, End of Watch: April 29, 1907; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature hereby designates Monday, May 6, 2013, as California Peace Officers' Memorial Day, and urges all Californians to remember those individuals who gave their lives for our safety and express appreciation to those who continue to dedicate themselves to making California a safer place in which to live and raise our families; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.