BILL NUMBER: SCR 43AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 5, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 3, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Senator DeSaulnier (Coauthor: Senator Wolk) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Bonilla and Buchanan) MAY 20, 2013 Relative to the CHP Officer Kenyon Youngstrom Memorial Undercrossing. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 43, as amended, DeSaulnier. CHP Officer Kenyon Youngstrom Memorial Undercrossing. This measure would designate a specified undercrossing on State Highway Route 680 in Contra Costa County as the CHP Officer Kenyon Youngstrom Memorial Undercrossing. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. Fiscal committee: yes. WHEREAS, California Highway Patrol (CHP) Officer Kenyon Marc Youngstrom was born October 8, 1974, in Pasadena, California; and WHEREAS, CHP Officer Youngstrom graduated from Arlington High School in Riverside in 1993, and attended California Baptist University in Riverside, as well as Napa Valley College, in Napa; and WHEREAS, CHP Officer Youngstrom, from a young age, recognized the importance of public service, and was known as a hard worker who always gave back to his community; and WHEREAS, CHP Officer Youngstrom served as a member of the United States Army Reserve for six years, achieving the rank of an E-4 Specialist; and WHEREAS, CHP Officer Youngstrom entered the CHP Academy in August 2005 and graduated in February 2006 (badge number 18063), and was initially assigned to the Contra Costa area; and WHEREAS, CHP Officer Youngstrom, after serving nearly three years in the Contra Costa area, voluntarily transferred to the Golden Gate Division as a member of the Field Support Unit, where he served as a distinguished member of the Protective Services Detail, responsible for providing protection to various dignitaries, heads of state, legislators, and other VIPs visiting the San Francisco Bay Area; and WHEREAS, CHP Officer Youngstrom transferred back to the Contra Costa area in August 2012 where he spent the remainder of his career; and WHEREAS, CHP Officer Youngstrom performed several duties over the course of his career, and because of his exceptional skills as an officer, he served as a mentor and recruiter for new officers to the CHP, as well as a RADAR and LIDAR instructor; and WHEREAS, CHP Officer Youngstrom, while assisting a fellow officer on September 4, 2012, with an enforcement stop on State Highway Route 680 (Interstate 680), was critically shot by the driver of the stopped vehicle, and passed away the following day at the John Muir Medical Center in Walnut Creek; and WHEREAS, CHP Officer Youngstrom, upon his death, gave the gift of life through organ and tissue donation, helping to save the lives of four individuals; and WHEREAS, CHP Officer Youngstrom was a man of family and faith, and was a member of the Community Bible Church of Vallejo in Vallejo; and WHEREAS, CHP Officer Youngstrom is survived by his wife, Karen, four children, Alexander, Madison, Andrew, and Kennedy, his parents, Gaylord and Jill Youngstrom, four brothers, and a sister; and WHEREAS, CHP Officer Youngstrom, as a father, leaves behind a legacy, instilled in his children, of a sense of respect and dignity; and WHEREAS, CHP Officer Youngstrom is admired for his professionalism, dedication, honesty, loyalty, respect, and courage; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the life, achievements, and distinguished career of CHP Officer Kenyon Marc Youngstrom, and his ultimate sacrifice while performing honorable and faithful service to the people of California as a CHP officer, are hereby recognized and honored; and be it further Resolved, That the State Highway Route 680 undercrossing at Livorna Road in Contra Costa County is hereby designated as the CHP Officer Kenyon Youngstrom Memorial Undercrossing; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover the cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.