BILL NUMBER: SCR 55ENROLLED BILL TEXT ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 15, 2013 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 12, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 3, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Senators Gaines and Nielsen JUNE 25, 2013 Relative to the Dean Patton Memorial Interchange. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 55, Gaines. Dean Patton Memorial Interchange. This measure would designate the interchange between State Highway Route 99 and Riego Road in Sutter County as the Dean Patton Memorial Interchange. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, Dean Patton, of Grass Valley, started his career with the Department of Transportation as a highway maintenance worker in 2006, initially assigned to the Marysville special crews yard as part of a stormwater and bridge crew, and more recently assigned to the Nevada City maintenance yard; and WHEREAS, In his private life, Mr. Patton sought to improve his community through public service, active involvement in the Twin Cities Church in Grass Valley, helping others better themselves through Alcoholics Anonymous, and coaching a Little League team for children with special needs; and WHEREAS, On May 2, 2013, Mr. Patton was struck by another vehicle and killed while riding his motorcycle on his day off on State Highway Route 99 at Riego Road in Sutter County on the way to the State Capitol in Sacramento, as a participant in the third annual Highway Workers Memorial Run, benefiting the children of fallen Caltrans employees; and WHEREAS, Mr. Patton is survived by his wife Trisha Flud, mother Joann Baldasarra, son Seth Sherman, and daughters Jessica Zeno and Felisha Dow, as well as three granddaughters, Brianna, Alyssa, and Savahna; and WHEREAS, Mr. Patton will be greatly missed by his family, friends, coworkers, and community, who will all get a measure of comfort knowing that the world is a better place because of Dean Patton; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the interchange between State Highway Route 99 and Riego Road in Sutter County as the Dean Patton Memorial Interchange; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover the cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.