California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR78 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/09/2014

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 78AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 9, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Senator Corbett FEBRUARY 3, 2014 Relative to Philippine Independence Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 78, as amended, Corbett. Philippine Independence Day. This measure would recognize June 12, 2014, as the 116th Anniversary of Philippine Independence, and would call upon the people of the state to observe the month of June with appropriate ceremonies, programs, and activities. Fiscal committee: no. WHEREAS, On June 12, 2014, the Filipino American community will celebrate the 116th Anniversary of Philippine Independence, and on this occasion it is appropriate to make special recognition of California's Filipino American citizens and thank them for their countless contributions to our nation's cultural, economic, and political heritage; and WHEREAS, The Philippine Declaration of Independence took place on June 12, 1898, in the town of Cavite  el Viejo (now   El Viejo, now  known as  Kawit)   Kawit, located  in the  Philippine  province of  Cavite in the Philippines   Cavite,  when Filipino revolutionary forces   forces,  under the leadership of General Emilio  Aguinaldo   Aguinaldo,  publicly read the Act of Declaration of Independence proclaiming the sovereignty and independence of the Philippine Islands from the colonial rule of Spain, after  United States   American  and Filipino revolutionary forces defeated Spain at the Battle of Manila Bay during the Spanish-American War; and WHEREAS, The declaration was not recognized by the United States or Spain. Spain later ceded the Philippines to the United States in the 1898 Treaty of Paris that ended the Spanish-American War. The United States government did not recognize Philippine  Independence   independence  until the signing of the Treaty of Manila on July 4, 1946; and WHEREAS, For nearly two decades, July 4 was observed in the Philippines as Independence Day until President Diosdado Macapagal, upon the advice of historians and the urging of nationalists, signed the Republic Act No. 4166 into law on August 4, 1964, designating the country's Independence Day as June 12. June 12  had   was  previously  been  observed as Flag Day and on that day many government buildings  had been   were  urged to display the Philippine flag in their offices; and WHEREAS, As the years went on, Filipino Americans became very involved in the community and made numerous contributions in all aspects of American society and culture, especially in California; and WHEREAS, Filipino Americans have also played a major role in California politics. There have been city mayors and other public officials  of Filipino descent  who have shaped the development of California over the  years who have been of Filipino descent; including,   years, including:  Tita Alice Bulos, also known as the  Godmother     "Grandmother  of Filipino American  politics,   politics";  our very own Chief Justice of California Tani  Cantil-Sakauye,   Cantil-Sakauye;  Mona Pasquil, former acting Lieutenant Governor of  California, the Mayor   California; former City of Milpitas Mayor Henry Manayan, the first individual of Filipino ancestry elected mayor in the United States; City  of Milpitas  Mayor  Jose  Esteves,   Esteves;  Union City Council Members Jim Navarro and Pat  Gacoscos,   Gacoscos;  Daly City  Vice Mayor Ray   Council Members Raymond A.  Buenaventura  , Daly City Council Member Mike Guingona, and Alameda Vice Mayor   and Michael P. Guingona; Assembly Member  Rob Bonta;  Acting Head of Post, Deputy Consul General of the Philippine Consulate General in San Francisco Jaime Ramon Ascalon; Alameda City Council Members Stewart Go Chen and Tony Daysog; Union Sanitary District Board of Directors Vice President Manny Fernandez; New Haven Unified School District Board of Education President Jonas Dino and Board Member Linda Canlas; Ci   ty of Carson Mayor Pro Tempore Elito Macapagal Santarina; Berryessa Union School District Board of Trustees Member Thelma Boac; San Jos Evergreen Community College District Board of Trustees Members Wendy Ho and Rudy Nasol; City of Artesia Council Member Victor Manalo; Town of Colma Council Member Joanne F. del Rosario; City of Hercules Mayor Myrna de Vera; City of Cerritos Mayor Mark E. Pulido; City of West Sacramento Mayor Christopher Cabaldon; Evergreen Elementary School District   Clerk Vince Songcayawon; San Mateo County Harbor District Board of Commissioners President Robert Bernardo; City of Vallejo Vice Mayor Bob Sampayan and City Council Members Jesus "Jess" Malgapo and Rozzana Verder-Aliga; City of Walnut Mayor Antonio "Tony" Cartagena; Jefferson Elementary School District Board of Education Member Joseph Otayde; and City of San Bruno Vice Mayor Ken Ibarra;  and WHEREAS, Many people of Filipino descent have contributed to great movements that have helped to shape our country and its role in the world, including the late Larry Dulay Itliong, labor organizer and the first vice president of the United Farm Workers  Union;   Union,  and the late Philip Vera Cruz, cofounder of the United Farm Workers Union; and WHEREAS, Many Filipino Americans have served with distinction as outstanding soldiers who fought as members of the United States Armed Forces for over a century and have sacrificed their lives in many wars, including World War II; and WHEREAS, Today there are 3.4 million people of Filipino American descent, many of whom have played vital roles in the development of the United  States   States,  and have paved the way for many Filipino Americans to continue to strengthen their roles in the broader  society,   society  and to contribute to American and California politics, economy, and culture; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature, in honor of the multitude of contributions that Filipino Americans have made to make this a better country and state for all people, recognizes June 12, 2014, as the 116th Anniversary of Philippine Independence and calls upon the people of the state to observe the month of June with appropriate ceremonies, programs, and activities; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.