BILL NUMBER: AB 1067AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 14, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 4, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 26, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Gipson FEBRUARY 26, 2015 An act to add Section 16001.8 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to foster children. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1067, as amended, Gipson. Foster children: rights. Existing law provides that it is the policy of the state that all minors and nonminors in foster care have specified rights, including, among others, the right to be free of the administration of medication or chemical substances, unless authorized by a physician. This bill would require the State Department of Social Services to convene a working groupto develop standardized information aboutregarding the specified rights of all minors and nonminors in foster care in order to educate them, foster care providers, and others, and would require the working group to be composed of, among others, theCaliforniaCounty Welfare Directors Association of California and foster children advocacy groups. The bill would provide the responsibilities of the working group, including making recommendations to the Legislature, by January 1, 2018, for revising the rights, and developing standardized information regarding the revised rights, by July 1, 2018, as specified. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 16001.8 is added to the Welfare and Institutions Code, to read: 16001.8. (a) The State Department of Social Services shall convene a working groupto develop standardized information aboutregarding the rights of all minors and nonminors in foster care, as specified in Section 16001.9, in order to educatethem,foster youth, foster care providers, and others.TheResponsibilities of the working group shall include all of the following: (1) By January 1, 2018, make recommendations to the Legislature for revising the rights based on a review of state law. (2) By July 1, 2018, develop standardized information regarding the revised rights in an age-appropriate manner and reflective of any relevant licensing requirements with respect to the foster care providers' responsibilities to adequately supervise children in care. (3) By July 1, 2018, develop recommendations regarding methods for disseminating the standardized information specified in paragraph (2). (4) By July 1, 2018, develop recommendations for measuring and improving, if necessary, the degree to which foster youth are adequately informed of their rights. (b) The working group shall be composed of all of the following: (1) The Office of the State Foster Care Ombudsperson.(a)(2) TheCaliforniaCounty Welfare DirectorsAssociation.Association of California.(b)(3) The Chief Probation Officers of California. (4) The County Behavioral Health Directors Association of California. (5) Current and former foster youth. (6) Foster parents and caregivers.(c)(7) Foster children advocacy groups.(d)(8) Foster care facilities associations.(e)(9) Any other interested parties.