California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1169 Amended / Bill

Filed 09/04/2015

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1169AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 4, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 17, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 20, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 26, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Gomez FEBRUARY 27, 2015 An act to add Section 12815 to the Government Code, relating to public resources. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1169, as amended, Gomez. Strategic Growth Council: state funding signs. Existing law establishes the Strategic Growth Council in state government that consists of various heads of state agencies and certain other members. Existing law requires the council to engage in certain activities, including identifying and reviewing activities and funding programs of member state agencies that may be coordinated to improve air and water quality, improve natural resources protection, increase the availability of affordable housing, improve transportation, meet the goals of the California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006, encourage sustainable land use planning, and revitalize urban and community centers in a sustainable manner. Existing law provides for the council to award grants and loans to support the planning and development of sustainable communities. This bill would require recipients of state grant funding from the council or its member state agencies for certain projects to post signs acknowledging the  source   sources  of funds for the project pursuant to guidelines adopted by the council. The bill, if a project is funded from state and nonstate sources, would require the state funding  source   sources  to be listed first if state funding equals 50% or more of  the  total project costs. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 12815 is added to the Government Code, to read: 12815. (a) For purposes of this section, "agency" means the Strategic Growth Council established pursuant to Section 75121 of the Public Resources Code or any of its member agencies. (b) An agency shall require  all  recipients of state grant funding from the agency for a project located in a public space and that provides public benefits, as determined by the agency, to post signs acknowledging the sources of funds for the project. If the project is funded from state and nonstate sources, the state funding sources shall be listed first if the state funding equals 50 percent or more of the total project costs. (c) The Strategic Growth Council shall develop model guidelines for the signage requirements. (d) Each agency shall develop signage requirements for its grant  program   programs  consistent with the model guidelines developed pursuant to subdivision (c).