California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1204 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/04/2015

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1204AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 4, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 7, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Chau FEBRUARY 27, 2015 An act to amend Sections 33530 and 33532 of the Education Code, relating to the Instructional Quality Commission. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1204, as amended, Chau. Instructional Quality Commission: membership: pupil members. Existing law establishes the Instructional Quality Commission consisting of certain members, including 13 public members appointed by the State Board of Education. Existing law requires the state board to make its appointments to ensure that, at any one time, 7 of the public members are current classroom or mentor teachers, as specified. Existing law provides that commission members are required to serve for 4-year terms and may not serve more than one full term. This bill would expand the public membership of the commission appointed by the state board to 14 members, and would require one of those members to be a pupil meeting specified requirements. The bill would provide that a pupil member of the commission is required to serve for a one-year term, may not serve more than one full term, and is a voting member with the full rights and duties of the other commission members. The bill would require the state board to make its appointments to ensure that, at any one time, 8 of the public members are current classroom or mentor teachers, as specified. The bill  would  also  would  make nonsubstantive changes to these provisions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 33530 of the Education Code is amended to read: 33530. (a) There is in the state government the Instructional Quality Commission consisting of a Member of the Assembly appointed by the Speaker of the Assembly, a Member of the Senate appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules, one public member appointed by the Speaker of the Assembly, one public member appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules, one public member appointed by the Governor, and 14 public members appointed by the state board upon the recommendation of the Superintendent or the members of the state board. (b) So far as is practical and consistent with the duties assigned to the commission by the state board, at least eight of the 14 public members appointed by the state board shall be persons, who because they have taught, written, or lectured on the subject matter fields specified in Section 33533, in the course of public or private employment, have become recognized authorities or experienced practitioners in those fields. The state board shall make its appointments to ensure that, at any one time, at least eight of the public members shall be current classroom teachers, or mentor teachers, or both assigned to teach kindergarten or any of grades 1 to 12, inclusive. (c) Notwithstanding the requirement that eight of the public members shall be current classroom teachers or mentor teachers, current members of the commission who were appointed on or before December 31, 2015, shall be allowed to complete their terms. (d) (1) So far as practical and consistent with the duties assigned to the commission by the state board, one of the 14 public members shall be a pupil. (2) Notwithstanding Section 1020 of the Government Code, the pupil member shall be, at the time the member's one-year term commences, a pupil enrolled in good standing in a public high school.  (3) The pupil member shall be chosen from among the two finalist candidates not chosen for nomination as the student member on the state board pursuant to Section 33000.5.  (e) In making the remaining appointments to the commission, and in establishing the commission's advisory task forces or committees, the state board is encouraged to consider the role of other representatives of the educational community in the development of curriculum and instructional materials, including, but not limited to, administrators, governing school board members, and parents who are reflective of the various ethnic groups and types of school districts in California. SEC. 2. Section 33532 of the Education Code is amended to read: 33532. (a) (1) Except as provided in paragraph (2), each commission member shall serve for a four-year term and shall not be eligible to serve more than one full term. Prior service on the commission for a term of less than three years resulting from an initial appointment or an appointment for the remainder of an unexpired term shall not be counted as a full term. (2) A pupil member of the commission shall serve for a one-year term and shall not be eligible to serve more than one full term. The pupil member shall be a voting member with the full rights and duties of the other members of the commission. (b) With respect to the appointment of 13 public members by the state board to the first commission, four shall be appointed for terms of two years, four shall be appointed for terms of three years, and five shall be appointed for a term of four years.