BILL NUMBER: AB 1221AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 26, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Salas FEBRUARY 27, 2015 An act to amend Section 33000 47612.1 of the Education Code, relating to the State Board of Education. charter schools . LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1221, as amended, Salas. State Board of Education. Charter schools: operations : instruction with partnership entities. Existing law, the Charter Schools Act of 1992, requires a pupil over 19 years of age, in order to be eligible for generating charter school apportionments, to be continuously enrolled in a public school and make satisfactory progress towards a high school diploma. Existing law provides an exception to those provisions for a charter school that provides instruction exclusively in partnership with one of specified entities if the charter school's charter was granted before July 1, 2014. The provision limiting that exception to charter schools chartered before July 1, 2014, becomes inoperative on July 1, 2015, and is repealed on January 1, 2016. This bill would continue until July 1, 2017, the operation of the requirement that the charter school be chartered before July 1, 2014. Existing law establishes the State Board of Education to consist of 10 members appointed by the Governor with the advice and consent of 2/3 of the Senate. This bill would make a nonsubstantive change to these State Board of Education provisions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no yes . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 47612.1 of the Education Code , as amended by Section 30 of Chapter 32 of the Statutes of 2014, is amended to read: 47612.1. (a) Except for the requirement that a pupil be a California resident, subdivision (b) of Section 47612 shall not apply to a charter school whose charter was granted by its chartering authority before July 1, 2014, and that provides instruction exclusively in partnership with any of the following: (1) The federal Workforce Investment Act of 1998 (Public Law No. 105-220; 29 U.S.C. Sec. 2801 et seq.). (2) Federally affiliated Youth Build programs. (3) Federal job corps training or instruction provided pursuant to a memorandum of understanding with the federal provider. (4) The California Conservation Corps or local conservation corps certified by the California Conservation Corps pursuant to Sections 14406 or 14507.5 of the Public Resources Code. (b) This section shall become inoperative on July 1, 2015, 2017 and, as of January 1, 2016, 2018, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that becomes operative on or before January 1, 2016, 2018, deletes or extends the dates on which it becomes inoperative and is repealed. SEC. 2. Section 47612.1 of the Education Code , as added by Section 31 of Chapter 32 of the Statutes of 2014, is amended to read: 47612.1. (a) Except for the requirement that a pupil be a California resident, subdivision (b) of Section 47612 shall not apply to a charter school program that provides instruction exclusively in partnership with any of the following: (1) The federal Workforce Investment Act of 1998 (Public Law No. 105-220; 29 U.S.C. Sec. 2801 et seq.). (2) Federally affiliated Youth Build programs. (3) Federal job corps training or instruction provided pursuant to a memorandum of understanding with the federal provider. (4) The California Conservation Corps or local conservation corps certified by the California Conservation Corps pursuant to Sections 14406 or 14507.5 of the Public Resources Code. (b) This section shall become operative on July 1, 2015. 2017. SECTION 1. Section 33000 of the Education Code is amended to read: 33000. There is established in the state government a State Board of Education, consisting of 10 members, who are appointed by the Governor with the advice and consent of two-thirds of the Senate.