BILL NUMBER: AB 1346AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 17, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE FEBRUARY 23, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 26, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Gray (Principal coauthors: Senators Hertzberg and Hill) ( Coauthors: Assembly Members Alejo, Dababneh, Gatto, Kim, Mullin, Rodriguez, and Wilk ) ( Coauthors: Senators Cannella and Wieckowski ) FEBRUARY 27, 2015 An act to amend Section 8587.8 of, and to add Section 8570.4 to the Government Code, relating to state government, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1346, as amended, Gray. Office of Emergency Services: State Emergency Plan and statewide earthquake early warning system. (1) The California Emergency Services Act requires the Governor to coordinate the State Emergency Plan and any programs necessary for the mitigation of the effects of an emergency in this state, as specified. Existing law requires the Office of Emergency Services to update the State Emergency Plan, on or beforeJanuary 1,July 31, 2015, to include proposed best practices for local governments and nongovernmental entities to use to mobilize and evacuate people with disabilities, and others with access and functional needs, during an emergency or natural disaster. This bill would require the Office of Emergency Services to update the State Emergency Plan on or before January 1, 2018, and every 5 years thereafter, and would require the plan to be consistent with specified state climate adaptation strategies. (2) Existing law requires the office, in collaboration withthe Alfred E. Alquist Seismic Safety Commission and otherspecified entities, to develop a comprehensive statewide earthquake early warning system in California through a public-private partnership, as specified. Existing law requires the office to identify funding for the system through single or multiple sources of revenue, and requires those sources to exclude the General Fund and to be limited to federal funds, funds from revenue bonds, local funds, and funds from private sources. Under existing law, the requirement that the office develop the system is not operative until funding is identified, and is repealed if funding is not identified by July 1, 2016. This bill would discontinue the requirement that the funding sources for the system exclude the General Fund and be limited to federal funds, funds from revenue bonds, local funds, and funds from private sources. The bill would delete the provisions providing for the repeal and the contingent operation of the requirement that the office develop the system. The bill would appropriate $23,100,000 from the General Fund to the office for the purpose of implementing the system. This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an urgency statute. Vote: 2/3. Appropriation: yes. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 8570.4 is added to the Government Code, to read: 8570.4. (a) The Office of Emergency Services shall update the State Emergency Plan on or before January 1, 2018, and every five years thereafter. (b) The State Emergency Plan shall be consistent with the following state climate adaptation strategies: (1) The Safeguarding California Plan published by the Natural Resources Agency. (2) The California Climate Adaptation Planning Guide published by the Natural Resources Agency and the Office of Emergency Services. (3) To the extent applicable, the Internet Web sitewww.cal-adapt.orgcal-adapt.org published by the California Energy Commission. SEC. 2. Section 8587.8 of the Government Code is amended to read: 8587.8. (a) The Office of Emergency Services, in collaboration with the California Institute of Technology (Caltech), the California Geological Survey, the University of California, the United States Geological Survey, the Alfred E. Alquist Seismic Safety Commission, and other stakeholders, shall develop a comprehensive statewide earthquake early warning system in California through a public-private partnership, which shall include, but not be limited to, the following features: (1) Installation of field sensors. (2) Improvement of field telemetry. (3) Construction and testing of central processing and notification centers. (4) Establishment of warning notification distribution paths to the public. (5) Integration of earthquake early warning education with general earthquake preparedness efforts. (b) In consultation with stakeholders, the Office of Emergency Services shall develop an approval mechanism to review compliance with earthquake early warning standards as they are developed. The development of the approval mechanism shall include input from a broad representation of earthquake early warning stakeholders. The approval mechanism shall accomplish all of the following: (1) Ensure the standards are appropriate. (2) Determine the degree to which the standards apply to providers and components of the system. (3) Determine methods to ensure compliance with the standards. (4) Determine requirements for participation in the system. (c) The Office of Emergency Services shall identify funding for the system described in subdivision (a) through single or multiple sources of revenue. SEC. 3. The sum of twenty-three million one hundred thousand dollars ($23,100,000) is hereby appropriated from the General Fund to the Office of Emergency Services for the purpose of implementing a comprehensive statewide earthquake early warning system pursuant to Section 8587.8 of the Government Code. SEC. 4. This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are: In order to protect the public from the continuing threat of loss of life and property damage due to earthquakes, it is necessary that this act take effect immediately.