California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1355 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 08/17/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1355CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 118 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 17, 2016 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR AUGUST 17, 2016 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 1, 2016 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JANUARY 15, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Gray FEBRUARY 27, 2015 An act to amend Section 12012.95 of the Government Code, relating to gaming. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1355, Gray. Gaming: Tribal Nation Grant Fund. Existing federal law, the Indian Gaming Regulatory Act of 1988, provides for the negotiation and execution of tribal-state gaming compacts for the purpose of authorizing certain types of gaming on Indian lands within a state. The California Constitution authorizes the Governor to negotiate and conclude compacts, subject to ratification by the Legislature. Existing law ratifies a number of tribal-state gaming compacts between the State of California and specified Indian tribes, including the compact entered into between the State of California and the Karuk Tribe. Existing law creates in the State Treasury the Indian Gaming Special Distribution Fund and the Indian Gaming Revenue Sharing Trust Fund for the receipt and deposit of moneys received by the state from Indian tribes pursuant to the terms of gaming compacts and authorizes moneys in those funds to be used for certain purposes. Existing law also creates the Tribal Nation Grant Fund in the State Treasury, to be administered by the California Gambling Control Commission, for the receipt and deposit of moneys received by the state from Indian tribes, pursuant to the terms of tribal-state gaming compacts, and authorizes moneys in the fund, upon appropriation by the Legislature, to be used for discretionary distribution to nongaming tribes and limited gaming tribes for purposes related to effective self-governance, self-determined community, and economic development. This bill would specify that the Tribal Nation Grant Fund reflects a vision of facilitating the development of tribal institutions and improving the quality of life of tribal people throughout the state. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 12012.95 of the Government Code is amended to read: 12012.95. (a) There is hereby created in the State Treasury the Tribal Nation Grant Fund for the receipt and deposit of moneys received by the state from Indian tribes pursuant to the terms of tribal-state gaming compacts. The fund reflects a vision of facilitating the development of tribal institutions and improving the quality of life of tribal people throughout the state. (b) The Tribal Nation Grant Fund shall be administered by the California Gambling Control Commission. Moneys in the fund shall be available, upon appropriation by the Legislature, for the discretionary distribution of funds to nongaming tribes and limited gaming tribes upon application of those tribes for purposes related to effective self-governance, self-determined community, and economic development.