BILL NUMBER: AB 1381AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 11, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 1, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 25, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 26, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Weber FEBRUARY 27, 2015 An act to amend Section 11317.2 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1381, as amended, Weber. Real estate appraisers. Existing law, the Real Estate Appraisers' Licensing and Certification Law, provides for the licensure and regulation of persons who engage in specified real estate appraisal activity by the Chief of the Bureau of Real Estate Appraisers. Existing law prohibits a person from engaging in real estate appraisal activity without obtaining a license issued by the Bureau of Real Estate Appraisers (formerly the Office of Real Estate Appraisers). Existing law requires a licensee to complete specified continuing education requirements in order to renew a license. Existing law requires the bureau to provide on the Internet information regarding, among other things, the status of every license and registration issued by the bureau. This bill would additionally require the bureau to provide, on the Internet,information regarding the continuing education courses taken by a licensee in order to renew a license to engage in real estate activity.the continuing education course information provided by a licensee when an individual applies for licensure renewal. The bill would also make various nonsubstantive changes. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 11317.2 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read: 11317.2. (a) (1) In addition to publishing the summary required by Section 11317, the bureau shall provide on the Internet information regarding the status of every license and registration issued by the bureau in accordance with the California Public Records Act (Chapter 3.5 (commencing with Section 6250) of Division 7 of Title 1 of the Government Code) and the Information Practices Act of 1977 (Chapter 1 (commencing with Section 1798) of Title 1.8 of Part 4 of Division 3 of the Civil Code). The public information to be provided on the Internet shall include information on suspensions and revocations of licenses and registrations issued by the bureau and accusations filed pursuant to the Administrative Procedure Act (Chapter 3.5 (commencing with Section 11340) of Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code) relative to persons or businesses subject to licensure, registration, or regulation by the bureau. The information shall not include personal information, including home telephone number, date of birth, or social security number. The bureau shall disclose a licensee's or registrant's address of record. However, the bureau shall allow a licensee or registrant to provide a post office box number or other alternate address, instead of his or her home address, as the address of record. This section shall not preclude the bureau from also requiring a licensee or registrant who has provided a post office box number or other alternative mailing address as his or her address of record to provide a physical business address or residence address only for the bureau's internal administrative use and not for disclosure as the licensee's or registrant's address of record or disclosure on the Internet. (2) In addition to the information required by subdivision (a), the bureau shall provide, on the Internet,information regarding the continuing education courses taken by a licensee in order to renew a license to engage in real estate appraisal activity.the continuing education course information provided by a licensee when an individual applies for licensure renewal. (b) The bureau shall not provide on the Internet identifying information with respect to private reprovals or letters of warning, which shall remain confidential. (c) For purposes of this section, "Internet" has the meaning set forth in paragraph (6) of subdivision (f) of Section 17538.