California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB14 Introduced / Bill

Filed 12/01/2014

 BILL NUMBER: AB 14INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Waldron DECEMBER 1, 2014 An act to add and repeal Title 24 (commencing with Section 110050) of the Government Code, relating to unmanned aircraft. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 14, as introduced, Waldron. Unmanned aircraft: task force. Existing federal law, the Federal Aviation Administration Modernization and Reform Act of 2012, provides for the integration of civil unmanned aircraft systems, commonly known as drones, into the national airspace system by September 30, 2015. Existing federal law requires the Administrator of the Federal Aviation Administration to develop and implement operational and certification requirements for the operation of public unmanned aircraft systems in the national airspace system by December 31, 2015. This bill would create the Unmanned Aircraft Task Force. The task force would be responsible for formulating a comprehensive plan for state regulation of unmanned aircraft. The task force would be required to submit, among other things, a comprehensive policy draft and suggested legislation pertaining to unmanned aircraft to the Legislature and the Governor on or before January 1, 2018. The bill would provide that these provisions are repealed on January 1, 2022. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Title 24 (commencing with Section 110050) is added to the Government Code, to read: TITLE 24. Unmanned Aircraft Task Force 110050. (a) The Legislature finds and declares that there is a need for California to have in place a comprehensive policy for the operation of unmanned aircraft, and a desire to work within the guidelines of the Federal Aviation Administration (FAA) as they are put in place. (b) It is the intent of the Legislature in enacting this title that the task force created by this act formulate a comprehensive plan for the state regarding unmanned aircraft. 110051. (a) There is hereby created the Unmanned Aircraft Task Force which shall operate for two years, until January 1, 2018. (b) The task force shall formulate a comprehensive plan for state regulation of unmanned aircraft, including, but not limited to, all of the following: (1) Reviewing regulations and guidance from the FAA regarding unmanned aircraft and incorporating them into a state policy draft. (2) Providing written recommendations, together with suggested legislation, for a comprehensive state policy for unmanned aircraft that protects privacy and allows the use of unmanned aircraft for public and private applications. (3) Evaluating complaints and concerns that are expressed to the task force regarding the use of unmanned aircraft. (4) Studying the private use of unmanned aircraft to encourage development of the unmanned aircraft industry in the private sector. (5) Studying and making recommendations with respect to ensuring that unmanned aircraft users comply with applicable laws, and assessing implementation plans and results. 110052. (a) Any written recommendations, suggested legislation, or other drafts or documents required to be prepared pursuant to Section 110051 shall be submitted to the Legislature and the Governor on or before January 1, 2018. (b) The materials described in subdivision (a) shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795. 110053. The task force shall consist of 10 members, as follows, who shall serve a two-year term: (a) The Adjutant General of the Military Department, or his or her designee, shall be an ex officio member of the task force. (b) Three members appointed by the Governor: (1) A member representing the California University System. (2) A member representing agriculture. (3) A member from the Governor's economic development group. (c) Three members appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules: (1) A member representing the aerospace industry. (2) A member representing the Academy of Model Aeronautics. (3) A member representing law enforcement. (d) Three members appointed by the Speaker of the Assembly: (1) A member representing business and industry. (2) Two public members who have participated in the unmanned aircraft industry and who have experience operating unmanned aircraft. 110054. (a) The task force may meet as frequently as necessary to carry out its responsibilities. (b) The members of the task force shall serve without compensation, but shall receive a per diem of one hundred dollars ($100) and reimbursement for actual and necessary expenses incurred in connection with the performance of their duties. 110055. The task force may appoint an executive director, who may employ staff upon approval by the task force. 110056. The task force shall be funded by an appropriation in the annual Budget Act. 110097. This title shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2022, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2022, deletes or extends that date.