California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1401 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/21/2015

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1401ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 20, 2015 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 22, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Baker FEBRUARY 27, 2015 An act to add Section 981.8 to the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1401, Baker. Veterans: student financial aid. Prior law, in effect until January 1, 2012, requested the Office of the Adjutant General to, among other things, make copies of the enrollment fee waiver application of the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges and the Free Application for Federal Student Aid (FAFSA) available to each member of the California National Guard, the State Military Reserve, and the Naval Militia not having a baccalaureate degree. Prior law also requested the Office of the Adjutant General to assist these persons in completing these forms, as needed. This bill would reinstate these provisions and request that the Adjutant General also make available additional information, including information regarding the federal Post-9/11 GI Bill and the California National Guard Education Assistance Award Program, and contact information for veterans' educational assistance. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 981.8 is added to the Military and Veterans Code, to read: 981.8. (a) The Office of the Adjutant General is requested to annually make all of the following available to each member of the California National Guard, the State Military Reserve, and the Naval Militia who does not have a baccalaureate degree: (1) A copy of the enrollment fee waiver application of the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges. (2) A copy of the Free Application for Federal Student Aid (FAFSA). (3) A copy of the latest brochure or information relative to the current federal Post-9/11 GI Bill. (4) A copy of the latest brochure or information relative to the California National Guard Education Assistance Award Program. (5) The contact information for a County Veterans Service Officer or the division responsible within the California Department of Veterans Affairs for higher education or the California National Guard. (b) The Office of the Adjutant General is requested to provide assistance as necessary to help the members complete the forms made available to them under subdivision (a).