California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1444 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/11/2015

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1444AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 11, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 26, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Eduardo Garcia FEBRUARY 27, 2015 An act to amend Sections 6300, 6302, and 6304 of, and to repeal Sections 6301, 6303, and 6305 of, the Government Code, relating to state government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1444, as amended, Eduardo Garcia. Foreign-trade zones. Existing law authorizes any public corporation, as defined, and specified private corporations to apply for the privilege of establishing, operating, and maintaining a foreign-trade zone in accordance with federal law, and provides that any public or private corporation whose application is granted pursuant to federal law is authorized to establish, operate, and maintain a foreign-trade zone, subject to specified conditions. Existing law also authorizes a public corporation, if authorized to establish, operate, and maintain a foreign trade zone, to provide the United States with indemnity or assurance and to deposit sums of money with the United States as requested. This bill would combine and reorganize these provisions and would repeal that indemnity and assurance provision. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 6300 of the Government Code is amended to read: 6300. The following definitions govern this chapter: (a) "Act of Congress" means the act of Congress approved June 18, 1934, entitled "An act to provide for the establishment, operation, and maintenance of foreign-trade zones in ports of entry of the United States, to expedite and encourage foreign commerce, and for other purposes"  (48 U.S. Stats. at L. Ch. 590).   (Public Law 73-397; 48 Stat. 998).  (b) "Public corporation" means the state, any political subdivision thereof, any incorporated municipality therein, any public agency of the state, of any political subdivision thereof, or of any municipality therein, or any corporate municipal instrumentality of this state or of this state and one or more other states.  (c) "Private corporation" means an entity organized under the laws of the state subsequent to September 15, 1935, for the purpose of establishing, operating, and maintaining a foreign-trade zone in accordance with the Act of Congress.  SEC. 2. Section 6301 of the Government Code is repealed. SEC. 3. Section 6302 of the Government Code is amended to read: 6302. (a) Any public corporation may apply for the privilege of establishing, operating, and maintaining a foreign-trade zone in accordance with the act of Congress. (b) Any private corporation  organized under the laws of the state subsequent to September 15, 1935, for the purpose of establishing, operating, and maintaining a foreign-trade zone in accordance with the act of Congress  may apply for the privilege of establishing, operating, and maintaining a foreign-trade zone in accordance with the act of Congress. SEC. 4. Section 6303 of the Government Code is repealed. SEC. 5. Section 6304 of the Government Code is amended to read: 6304. Any public or private corporation authorized by this chapter to make an application and whose application is granted pursuant to the terms of the act of Congress may establish, operate, and maintain the foreign-trade zone: (a) Subject to the conditions and restrictions of the act of Congress, and any amendments thereto. (b) Under such rules and regulations and for the period of time that may be prescribed by the board established by the act of Congress to carry out the act. SEC. 6. Section 6305 of the Government Code is repealed.