California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1447 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/26/2015

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1447AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 26, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Low FEBRUARY 27, 2015 An act to  amend Section 40003 of   add Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 18050) to Division 12.7 to  the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1447, as amended, Low. Solid waste:  beverage containers.   PET food and beverage packaging.  The California Integrated Waste Management Act of 1989, which is administered by the Department of Resources Recycling and Recovery, generally regulates the management and recycling of solid waste.  The California Beverage Container Recycling and Litter Reduction Act requires a distributor to pay a redemption payment for every beverage container sold or offered for sale in the state to the department. Existing law provides that nothing in the waste act affects the duties of the department under the beverage act.   Existing law requires all rigid plastic bottles and rigid plastic containers, including bottles and containers composed of polyethylene terephthalate, sold in California on and after January 1, 1992, to be labeled   with a code which indicates the resin used to produce the rigid plastic bottle or rigid plastic container.   This bill would require, on and after January 1, 2017, and annually thereafter, a California manufacturer of containers primarily composed of polyethylene terephthalate (PET) and used for food or beverages to report to the department, in a manner determined by the department, certain information, including the total amount of tons of new PET plastic packaging made for sale by that manufacturer.   This bill would make nonsubstantive changes to that provision.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee:  no   yes  . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 18050) is added to Division 12.7 of the   Public Resources Code   , to read:   CHAPTER 3. PET FOOD PLASTIC PACKAGING 18050. For purposes of this chapter, "PET plastic packaging" means packaging consisting primarily of polyethylene terephthalate (PET) and used to contain food or beverages. 18052. On and after January 1, 2017, and annually thereafter, every manufacturer of PET plastic packaging in the state shall report to the Department of Resources Recycling and Recovery, in a manner determined by the department, both of the following: (a) The total amount of tons of new PET plastic packaging made for sale by that manufacturer. (b) The total amount of postfilled PET plastic used in the manufacturing of that packaging.   SECTION 1.   Section 40003 of the Public Resources Code is amended to read: 40003. Nothing in this division abrogates, limits, or otherwise affects the duties of the department under the California Beverage Container Recycling and Litter Reduction Act (Division 12.1 (commencing with Section 14500)).