California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1494 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/01/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1494AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 1, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 26, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 14, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 4, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 22, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 7, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Levine (  Coauthor:   Assembly Member   Gallagher   Coauthors:   Assembly Members   Gallagher   and Gonzalez  ) (  Coauthor:   Senator   McGuire   Coauthors:   Senators   Anderson   and McGuire  ) FEBRUARY 27, 2015 An act to amend Section 14291 of, and to repeal Section 14276 of, the Elections Code, relating to voting. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1494, as amended, Levine. Voting: marked ballots. Existing law prohibits a voter from showing his or her ballot after it is marked in such a way as to reveal its contents. Existing law provides that a person who interferes or attempts to interfere with the secrecy of voting is guilty of a felony, and authorizes the Secretary of State, the Attorney General, or a local elections official to bring an action to impose additional civil penalties for committing those acts. This bill would authorize a voter to voluntarily disclose how he or she voted or distribute an image of his or her own marked ballot if that voluntary act does not violate any other law. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 14276 of the Elections Code is repealed. SEC. 2. Section 14291 of the Elections Code is amended to read: 14291. (a) After the ballot is marked, a voter shall not show it to any person  in such a way as to reveal   in a manner that reveals  its contents, except as provided in subdivision (b). (b) A voter may voluntarily disclose how he or she voted or distribute an image of his or her own marked ballot if that voluntary act does not violate any other law.