California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1494 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/08/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1494AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 8, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 15, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 1, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 26, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 14, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 4, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 22, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 7, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Levine (Coauthors: Assembly Members Gallagher and Gonzalez) (Coauthors: Senators Anderson, Hertzberg, and McGuire) FEBRUARY 27, 2015 An act to amend Section 14291 of, and to repeal Section 14276 of, the Elections Code, relating to voting. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1494, as amended, Levine. Voting: marked ballots. Existing law prohibits a voter from showing his or her ballot to any person after it is marked in such a way as to reveal its contents. Existing law provides that a person who interferes or attempts to interfere with the secrecy of voting is guilty of a felony, and authorizes the Secretary of State, the Attorney General, or a local elections official to bring an action to impose additional civil penalties for committing those acts. This bill would  clarify that   create an exception to that prohibition that would permit  a voter  may   to  voluntarily disclose how he or she voted if that voluntary act does not violate any other law. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 14276 of the Elections Code is repealed. SEC. 2. Section 14291 of the Elections Code is amended to read: 14291. (a) After the ballot is marked, a voter shall not show it to any person in a manner that reveals its  contents.   contents, except as provided in subdivision (b).  (b) A voter may voluntarily disclose how he or she voted if that voluntary act does not violate any other law.