California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1507 Amended / Bill

Filed 07/09/2015

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1507AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 9, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 16, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Committee on Labor and Employment (Assembly Members Roger Hernndez (Chair), Chu, Low, McCarty, and Thurmond) MARCH 4, 2015 An act to  amend Sections 47605.1, 47612.1, 52052.3, 52302.8, 52520, 53082, 69439, 84830, and 88640 of the Education Code, to amend Sections 1091.2, 12803.6, and 95501 of the Government Code, to amend Section 4658.7 of the Labor Code, to amend Section 999.80 of the Military and Veterans Code, to amend Section 14403 of the Public Resources Code, to amend Sections 320.5, 325.6, 1177.5, 1269, 1279.5, 2051, 9809.5, 10200, 10204, 10205, 11024, 18002, and 18008 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, and to amend Section 16522.1 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to job training.   add Section 832.35 to the Penal Code, relating to peace officers.  LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1507, as amended, Committee on Labor and Employment.  California Workforce Investment Act.   Peace officers: training.   Existing federal law, commonly known as Public Law 280, authorizes the state to exercise jurisdiction over offenses committed by or against Indians in the areas of Indian country within the state, and gives state criminal laws the same force and effect within Indian country as they have elsewhere in the state.   Existing state law creates the Commission on Peace Officer Standards and Training that, among other things, establishes levels of standards and training for peace officers, as specified. Existing law requires the commission to implement courses of training related to various topics applicable to peace officers.   This bill would require each police chief, county sheriff, or other head of a law enforcement agency to assess his or her jurisdiction to determine if any Indian tribal lands lie within the jurisdiction. The bill would require the police chief, county sheriff, or other head of a law enforcement agency, if he or she determines that Indian tribal lands exist within his or her jurisdiction, to ensure that those peace officers employed by the agency who work in, or adjacent to, Indian tribal lands, or who may be responsible for responding to calls for service on, or adjacent to, Indian tribal lands, complete a course that includes, but is not limited to, a review of Public Law 280. By creating new duties for local officials, the bill would impose a state-mandated local program.   The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement.   This bill would provide that, if the Commission on State Mandates determines that the bill contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement for those costs shall be made pursuant to these statutory provisions.   Existing law, the federal Workforce Investment Act of 1998, authorizes workforce investment activities, including activities in which states may participate. Existing federal law, the Workforce Innovation and Opportunity Act, beginning July 1, 2015, repeals and supersedes that act and provides for the establishment of a state workforce development board to develop strategies to support the use of career pathways for the purpose of providing individuals with workforce investment activities, education, and support services necessary for them to enter the workforce or retain employment. Existing law contains various programs for job training and employment investment, including work incentive programs.   This bill would update statutory references to the federal Workforce Investment Act of 1998 to instead refer to the federal Workforce Innovation and Opportunity Act and make related conforming changes.   By revising the duties of local workforce investment boards to conform to the federal Workforce Innovation and Opportunity Act, this bill would impose a state-mandated local program.   The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement.   This bill would provide that no reimbursement is required by this act for a specified reason.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 832.35 is added to the   Penal Code   ,  immediately following Section 832.3  , to read:   832.35. (a) Each police chief, county sheriff, or other head of a law enforcement agency shall assess his or her jurisdiction to determine if any Indian tribal lands lie within the jurisdiction. (b) If the police chief, county sheriff, or other head of a law enforcement agency determines that Indian tribal lands exist within his or her jurisdiction, he or she shall ensure that those peace officers employed by the agency who work in, or adjacent to, Indian tribal lands, or who may be responsible for responding to calls for service on, or adjacent to, Indian tribal lands, complete a course that includes, but is not limited to, a review of Public Law 280 (18 U.S.C. Sec. 1162; 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1360; and 25 U.S.C. Secs. 1321 through 1326, inclusive).   SEC. 2.   If the Commission on State Mandates determines that this act contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement to local agencies and school districts for those costs shall be made pursuant to Part 7 (commencing with Section 17500) of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Government Code.  All matter omitted in this version of the bill appears in the bill as amended in the Assembly, April 16, 2015. (JR11)