BILL NUMBER: AB 1529AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 4, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Committee on Veterans Affairs MARCH 18, 2015 An act relating to student financial aid. to repeal Section 69999.30 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1529, as amended, Committee on Veterans Affairs. California National Guard Education Assistance Award Program. Existing law establishes various student financial aid programs under the administration of the Student Aid Commission, and establishes eligibility requirements for the receipt of awards under those programs by participating students attending qualifying institutions. Existing law, until July 1, 2019, establishes the California National Guard Education Assistance Award Program, which provides financial aid to qualifying members of the California National Guard, the State Military Reserve, and the Naval Militia, under the administration of the commission. Existing law requires the Legislative Analyst, on or before January 1, 2016, to prepare and submit to the Legislature a report on the program. This bill would express the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation regarding extending the program beyond July 1, 2019, after receiving and considering the Legislative Analyst's report. delete the sunset date for this financial aid program, thereby extending the program indefinitely. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no yes . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 69999.30 of the Education Code is repealed. 69999.30. This article shall become inoperative on July 1, 2019, and, as of January 1, 2020, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that becomes operative on or before January 1, 2020, deletes or extends the dates on which it becomes inoperative and is repealed. SECTION 1. It is the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation regarding extending the California National Guard Education Assistance Award Program beyond its inoperative date of July 1, 2019, after receiving and considering the Legislative Analyst's report described in Section 69999.26 of the Education Code.