California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1549 Amended / Bill

Filed 01/13/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1549AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 13, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 4, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Wood SEPTEMBER 11, 2015 An act to add Section 14051 to the Government Code, relating to highways. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1549, as amended, Wood. Department of Transportation: state highway rights-of-way: fiber-optic cables: inventory. Existing law provides that the Department of Transportation has full possession and control of state highways and associated property. Existing law provides for the department to issue encroachment permits with respect to structures and activities in, under, or over any portion of the right-of-way of a state highway. This bill would require the department to maintain an inventory of all conduits  owned by the department  that house fiber-optic communication  cables   cables, that are  located on state highway  rights-of-way,   rights-of-way, and that were installed on or after January 1, 2017,  and to make that information available to the public upon request. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 14051 is added to the Government Code, to read: 14051. The department shall maintain an inventory of all conduits  owned by the department  that house fiber-optic communication  cables   cables, that are  located on state highway  rights-of-way.   rights-of-way, and that were installed on or after January 1, 2017.  The department shall make the information available to the public upon request.