California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1549 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 09/23/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1549CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 505 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 23, 2016 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 23, 2016 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 23, 2016 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 29, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 19, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 30, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 22, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 16, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 14, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 13, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 4, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Wood SEPTEMBER 11, 2015 An act to add Section 14051 to the Government Code, relating to highways. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1549, Wood. Department of Transportation: state highway rights-of-way: broadband: fiber optic cables. Existing law provides that the Department of Transportation has full possession and control of state highways and associated property. Existing law provides for the department to issue encroachment permits with respect to structures and activities in, under, or over any portion of the right-of-way of a state highway. This bill would require the department to notify companies and organizations working on broadband deployment on its Internet Web site of specified department-led highway construction projects and would authorize those companies and organizations to collaborate with the department to install a broadband conduit as part of each project. The bill would require the department, in consultation with stakeholders, on or before January 1, 2018, to develop guidelines to facilitate the installation of broadband conduit on state highway rights-of-way. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 14051 is added to the Government Code, to read: 14051. (a) For purposes of this section, "companies or organizations working on broadband deployment" includes, but is not limited to, local governments, nonprofit organizations, cable television corporations, as defined in Section 216.4 of the Public Utilities Code, and telephone corporations, as defined in Section 234 of the Public Utilities Code. (b) (1) During the project planning phase of a department-led highway construction project that was initiated on or after January 1, 2017, is parallel to the highway, and involves construction methods that are suitable for installing broadband conduit, the department shall notify companies and organizations working on broadband deployment of the project on its Internet Web site to encourage collaborative broadband installations. (2) For the purpose of supporting fiber optic communication cables, after receiving notification from the department, a company or organization working on broadband deployment may collaborate with the department to install a broadband conduit as part of the project. (3) The department, in consultation with stakeholders, on or before January 1, 2018, shall develop guidelines to facilitate the installation of broadband conduit on state highway rights-of-way. The guidelines shall address access to information on existing assets and collaboration on future projects.