BILL NUMBER: AB 1592AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 15, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 2, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 22, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 6, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 28, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Bonilla (Coauthors: Assembly Members Travis Allen, Baker, Nazarian, and Obernolte) JANUARY 6, 2016 An act to add Section 38755 to the Vehicle Code, relating to autonomous vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1592, as amended, Bonilla. Autonomous vehicles: pilot project. Existing law permits the operation of an autonomous vehicle on public roads for testing purposes if, among other requirements, a driver is seated in the driver's seat and is capable of taking immediate manual control of the vehicle in the event of an autonomous technology failure or other emergency. This bill would, notwithstanding the above provision, authorize the Contra Costa Transportation Authority to conduct a pilot project for the testing of autonomous vehicles that do not have an operator and are not equipped with a steering wheel, a brake pedal, or an accelerator if the testing is conducted only at specified locations and the autonomous vehicle operates at speeds of less than 35 miles per hour. The bill would require the authority or a private entity, or a combination of the two, to obtain an instrument of insurance, surety bond, or proof of self-insurance in an amount of $5,000,000 prior to the start of testing of any autonomous vehicle on or across a public road and would require evidence of the insurance, surety bond, or proof of self-insurance to be provided to the Department of Motor Vehicles in the form and manner required by the department.The bill would allow the department to require the submission of information and data regarding the testing of autonomous vehicles tested pursuant to these provisions.The bill would require the operator of the autonomous vehicle technology to disclose what personal information concerning a pilot project participant is collected by an autonomous vehicle. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 38755 is added to the Vehicle Code, to read: 38755. (a) Notwithstanding Section 38750, the Contra Costa Transportation Authority is authorized to conduct a pilot project for the testing of autonomous vehicles that do not have an operator and are not equipped with a steering wheel, a brake pedal, or an accelerator provided the following requirements are met: (1) The testing shall be conducted only at a privately owned business park designated by the authority, inclusive of public roads within the designated business park, and at GoMentum Station located within the boundaries of the former Concord Naval Weapons Station. (2) The autonomous vehicle shall operate at speeds of less than 35 miles per hour.(3)(b) A change in ownership of the property comprising the GoMentum Station shall not affect the authorization to conduct testing pursuant to this section.(b)(c) Prior to the start of the testing of an autonomous vehicle that does not have an operator on or across a public road, the Contra Costa Transportation Authority or a private entity, or a combination of the two, shall obtain an instrument of insurance, surety bond, or proof of self-insurance in an amount of five million dollars ($5,000,000), and shall provide evidence of the insurance, surety bond, or proof of self-insurance to the Department of Motor Vehicles in the form and manner required by the department.(c)(d) The operator of the autonomous vehicle technology tested pursuant to this section shall disclose to an individual who participates in the pilot project what personal information, if any, concerning the pilot project participant is collected by an autonomous vehicle.(d) The department may require the submission of information and data regarding the testing of autonomous vehicles tested pursuant to this section.(e) This section does not limit the authority of the department to promulgate regulations governing the testing and operation of autonomous vehicles on public roads, with or without the presence of a driver inside the vehicle, pursuant to Section 38750.