California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1781 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/11/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1781AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 11, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 17, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Lopez FEBRUARY 4, 2016 An act to add Section  66061   8209.5  to the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.   child development programs.  LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1781, as amended, Lopez.  Public postsecondary education: child   Child  development programs.  The Child Care and Development Services Act declares its purpose is to provide a comprehensive, coordinated, and cost-effective system of child care and development services for children from infancy to 13 years of age and their parents, including a full range of supervision, health, and support services through full- and part-time programs.   This bill would require the Superintendent of Public Instruction, in conjunction with Department of Education and other appropriate state agencies and stakeholders, to (1) convene a task force to examine rules and regulations regarding priorities established for children attending child development programs under contract with the department, (2) report to the Legislature as to whether these priorities should be amended to give priority to children of California National Guard students or other military personnel students, and (3) develop plans for these child development programs to implement in order to support the children in cases of state emergency when the students are called to duty.   Under existing law, the University of California, under the administration of the Regents of the University of California, the California State University, under the administration of the Trustees of the California State University, and the California Community Colleges, under the administration of the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges, are the 3 segments of public postsecondary education in this state.   Existing law authorizes higher educational institutions to establish and maintain child development programs on or near their respective campuses.   This bill would require child development programs established by the California Community Colleges, the California State University, and the University of California to give specified priority to children of students who are active duty members of the California National Guard.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION   1.   Section 8209.5 is added to the   Education Code   , to read:   8209.5. The Superintendent, in conjunction with the department and other appropriate state agencies and stakeholders, shall comply with all of the following requirements: (a) Convene a task force to examine the most current rules and regulations regarding priorities established for children attending a child development program under contract with the department. (b) (1) Submit a written report, on or before January 31, 2018, to the appropriate policy committees of the Legislature that opines whether priorities described in subdivision (a) should be amended to give priority to children of California National Guard students or other military personnel students. (2) A report to be submitted pursuant to this subdivision shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code. (c) Develop plans for child development programs under contract with the department to implement in order to support children of California National Guard students or other military personnel students in cases of state emergency when these students are called to duty.   SECTION 1.   Section 66061 is added to the Education Code, to read: 66061. (a) Child development programs established by the California Community Colleges, the California State University, and the University of California pursuant to Section 66060 shall give priority to children of students who are active duty members of the California National Guard. (b) Priority pursuant to subdivision (a) shall not exceed other priorities established, as of January 1, 2017, by the public postsecondary educational institution or the Superintendent of Public Instruction for the program.