California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB18 Introduced / Bill

Filed 12/01/2014

 BILL NUMBER: AB 18INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Dodd (Principal coauthor: Senator Wolk) (Coauthor: Assembly Member Bonilla) DECEMBER 1, 2014 An act to amend Section 8686 of the Government Code, relating to disaster relief, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 18, as introduced, Dodd. Disaster relief: South Napa Earthquake. The California Disaster Assistance Act generally provides that the state share for disaster project allocations to local agencies is no more than 75% of total state eligible costs, except for specified events for which the state share is up to 100% of state eligible costs. This bill would add the August 24, 2014, South Napa Earthquake, to the list of events for which the state share of state eligible cost is up to 100% and exempt the county from a specified planning requirement as a condition of receiving this level of assistance. This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an urgency statute. Vote: 2/3. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 8686 of the Government Code is amended to read: 8686. (a) For any eligible project, the state share shall amount to no more than 75 percent of total state eligible costs. (b) Notwithstanding subdivision (a), the state share shall be up to 100 percent of total state eligible costs connected with the following events: (1) The October 17, 1989, Loma Prieta earthquake. (2) The October 20, 1991, East Bay fire. (3) The fires that occurred in southern California from October 1, 1993, to November 30, 1993, inclusive. (4) The January 17, 1994, Northridge earthquake. (5) Storms that occurred in California during the periods commencing January 3, 1995, and February 13, 1995, as specified in agreements between this state and the United States for federal financial assistance. (6) The storms that occurred in California in December of 1996 and early January of 1997, as specified in agreements between this state and the United States for federal financial assistance. (7) The winter storms and flooding that occurred from February 1, 1998, to April 30, 1998, inclusive, as specified in agreements between this state and the United States for federal financial assistance. (8) The wildfires that occurred in southern California commencing October 21, 2003, as specified in agreements between this state and the United States for federal financial assistance. (9) The December 22, 2003, San Simeon earthquake, as specified in agreements between this state and the United States for federal financial assistance. (10) The severe storms, flooding, debris flows, and mudslides that occurred during December 27, 2004, to January 11, 2005, inclusive, in southern California, as specified in agreements between this state and the United States for federal financial assistance. (11) The severe storms, flooding, landslides, and mud and debris flows that occurred in southern California during the period from February 16 to February 23, 2005, inclusive, as specified in agreements between this state and the United States for federal financial assistance. (12) The severe storms, flooding, mudslides, and landslides that occurred in northern California during the period from December 17, 2005, to January 3, 2006, inclusive, as specified in agreements between this state and the United States for federal financial assistance. (13) The severe storms and flooding that occurred in northern and central California during the period from March 29, 2006, to April 16, 2006, inclusive, as specified in agreements between this state and the United States for federal financial assistance.  (14) The August 24, 2014, South Napa Earthquake.  (c) For any federally declared disaster subsequent to January 1, 1995, that the Legislature has designated in subdivision (b), the state shall assume the increased share specified in subdivision (b) in those cases where the Federal Emergency Management Agency or another applicable federal agency has approved the federal share of costs. (d) The state shall make no allocation for any project application resulting in a state share of less than two thousand five hundred dollars ($2,500) under this section. SEC. 2. This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are: In order to timely provide essential relief to those persons who have suffered damage or loss as a result of the August 24, 2014, South Napa Earthquake, it is necessary that this act take effect immediately.